EP0979035 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING PLANTS WITH EXOGENOUS CHEMICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Technology LLC 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [2001/29] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRINKER, Ronald, J. 925 Oakgrove Park Court Ellisville, MO 63021 / US | 02 /
GILLESPIE, Jane, L. 7229 Cornell St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | 03 /
RAYMOND, Peter, J. 624 McBride Point Drive Wildwood, MO 63198 / US | 04 /
SANDBRINK, Joseph, J. 12417 Rekart Lane Des Peres, MO 63122 / US | 05 /
WARNER, James, M. Webster Groves Missouri 63119 / US | 06 /
WIDEMAN, Al, S. 13242 Windygate Lane St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | 07 /
WRIGHT, Daniel, R. 5911 Clifton Avenue St. Louis, MO 63109 / US | [2000/20] |
Former [2000/07] | 01 /
BRINKER, Ronald, J. 925 Oakgrove Park Court Ellisville, MO 63021 / US | ||
02 /
GILLESPIE, Jane, L. 7229 Cornell St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | |||
03 /
RAYMOND, Peter, J. 624 McBride Point Drive Wildwood, MO 63198 / US | |||
04 /
SANDBRINK, Joseph, J. 12417 Rekart Lane Des Peres, MO 63122 / US | |||
05 /
WARNER, James, M. 6837 Pershing Avenue University City, MO 63130 / US | |||
06 /
WIDEMAN, Al, S. 13242 Windygate Lane St. Louis, MO 63146 / US | |||
07 /
WRIGHT, Daniel, R. 5911 Clifton Avenue St. Louis, MO 63109 / US | Representative(s) | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Europe S.A./N.V. Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Services International S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270/272 Letter Box No. 1 1150 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [2000/07] | Bosch, Henry, et al Monsanto Services International SA Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 98903811.2 | 30.01.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998US01684 | Priority number, date | US19970034887P | 31.01.1997 Original published format: US 34887 P | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9833384 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979035 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979035 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/20, // (A01N57/20, 35:06, 41:04) | [2000/07] | CPC: |
A01N47/24 (EP,US);
A01N25/28 (EP,US);
A01N25/30 (EP,US);
A01N33/22 (EP,US);
A01N35/06 (EP,US);
A01N37/22 (EP,US);
A01N37/40 (EP,US);
A01N39/04 (EP,US);
A01N41/04 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/50 (EP,US);
A01N47/36 (EP,US);
A01N57/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N33/22, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N33/22, A01N37/48, A01N37/38, A01N37/34, A01N37/28, A01N37/20, A01N37/10, A01N37/02, A01N35/02, A01N31/04 (EP,US);
A01N35/06, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N35/06, A01N61/00, A01N57/20 (EP,US);
A01N37/22, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/40, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N39/04, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N39/04, A01N37/48, A01N37/38, A01N37/34, A01N37/28, A01N37/20, A01N37/10, A01N37/02, A01N35/02, A01N31/04 (EP,US);
A01N41/04, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N41/04, A01N61/00, A01N57/20 (US,EP);
A01N43/40, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/40, A01N37/48, A01N37/38, A01N37/34, A01N37/28, A01N37/20, A01N37/10, A01N37/02, A01N35/02, A01N31/04 (EP,US);
A01N43/50, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/50, A01N37/48, A01N37/38, A01N37/34, A01N37/28, A01N37/20, A01N37/10, A01N37/02, A01N35/02, A01N31/04 (US,EP);
A01N47/24, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N57/20, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N57/20, A01N37/48, A01N37/38, A01N37/34, A01N37/28, A01N37/20, A01N37/10, A01N37/02, A01N35/02, A01N31/04 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PFLANZEN MIT EXOGENEN CHEMIKALIEN | [2000/07] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING PLANTS WITH EXOGENOUS CHEMICALS | [2000/07] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE POUR TRAITER LES PLANTES AVEC DES PRODUITS CHIMIQUES EXOGENES | [2000/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.2002 | BE | 04.12.2002 | CH | 04.12.2002 | FI | 04.12.2002 | FR | 04.12.2002 | GR | 04.12.2002 | IT | 04.12.2002 | LI | 04.12.2002 | NL | 04.12.2002 | IE | 30.01.2003 | LU | 30.01.2003 | MC | 31.01.2003 | DK | 04.03.2003 | GB | 04.03.2003 | SE | 04.03.2003 | DE | 05.03.2003 | PT | 05.03.2003 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
FR | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
IE | 30.01.2003 | ||
LU | 30.01.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2003 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
GB | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
DE | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
IE | 30.01.2003 | ||
LU | 30.01.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2003 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
GB | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
DE | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
IE | 30.01.2003 | ||
LU | 30.01.2003 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
GB | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
DE | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
IE | 30.01.2003 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
GB | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
DE | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
IE | 30.01.2003 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
DE | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
DE | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
DK | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
DE | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
BE | 04.12.2002 | ||
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
FI | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
CH | 04.12.2002 | ||
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
LI | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 04.12.2002 | |
GR | 04.12.2002 | ||
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 04.12.2002 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | SE | 04.03.2003 | |
PT | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 04.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2119860 (ARIES ROBERT) [X] 1-5,10,13,14,26-29,31,32,35,36,48,60,61 * page 1 - page 5, line 7 * * claim 1 *; | [X]FR2124092 (ARIES ROBERT) [X] 1-5,10,13,14,26-29,31,32,35,36,48,60,61 * page 2, line 5 - page 4, line 28; claim - *; | [X]FR2131819 (ARIES ROBERT) [X] 1-5,10-14,26-29,31-36,48,60,61 * page 1 - page 4, line 35; claim 1 * * page 7, line 20 - page 9, line 3 *; | [X]FR2168186 (DYNACHIM SARL [FR]) [X] 1-5,10-14,26-29,31-36,48,60,61 * page 1 - page 9 * * page 12, line 31 - page 20, line 18; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0036106 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-64 * page 1 - page 4, line 19 *; | [X]EP0134198 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-6,10-15,26-29,31-36,48,60,61 * page 1 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; table 3 * * page 29; claims 1,4,10-18 *; | [A]EP0243522 (UNION OIL CO [US]) [A] 1-64 * page 2 - page 3, line 44 ** page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 29 *; | [X]WO8903176 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [GB]) [X] 31-33,35,36,48,60,61 * examples VI,X *; | [X]EP0390743 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,13,26,29,31,35,48,60,61 * page 2, line 1 - line 48 * * see page 3, formula IV; page 6, line 38 - page 7, line 18 * * see biological example B2 and formulation examples F2s)-z);; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US5356861 (GEDNALSKI JOE V [US], et al) [A] 1-64 * column 1 - column 4, line 33 * |