Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968193

EP0968193 - PHENYLSULPHONYL UREAS, PROCESSES FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES AND PLANT-GROWTH REGULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2007
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/20]For all designated states
Bayer CropScience AG
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50
40789 Monheim / DE
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Bayer CropScience GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Aventis CropScience GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
Aventis CropScience GmbH
Miraustr. 54
13509 Berlin / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Hoechst Schering AgrEvo GmbH
Miraustrasse 54
13509 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LORENZ, Klaus
Am Helgengraben 18
D-64331 Weiterstadt / DE
02 / WILLMS, Lothar
Königsteiner Strasse 50
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
03 / BAUER, Klaus
Doorner Strasse 53d
D-63456 Hanau / DE
04 / BIERINGER, Hermann
Eichenweg 26
D-65817 Eppstein / DE
05 / ROSINGER, Christopher
Am Hochfeld 33
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98904053.010.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP00116
Priority number, dateDE199710220023.01.1997         Original published format: DE 19702200
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9832743
Date:30.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968193
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968193
Date:21.02.2007
Language:DE
[2007/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/54, C07D239/47, C07D239/42, C07D251/46, C07D251/52, C07D251/42, C07D403/12, C07D401/12, C07D417/12, C07D405/12, A01N47/36, // C07C311/47
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:PHENYLSULFONYLHARNSTOFFE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE UND PFLANZENWACHSTUMSREGULATOREN[2000/01]
English:PHENYLSULPHONYL UREAS, PROCESSES FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES AND PLANT-GROWTH REGULATORS[2000/01]
French:UREES PHENYLSULFONIQUES, PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE LES PREPARER ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE LES HERBICIDES ET LES REGULATEURS DE CROISSANCE VEGETALE[2006/27]
Former [2000/01]UREES PHENYLSULFONIQUES, PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE LES PREPARER ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES ET COMME REGULATEURS DE CROISSANCE VEGETALE
Entry into regional phase23.08.1999National basic fee paid 
23.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
21.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
17.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2006Fee for grant paid
27.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK21.02.2007
IT21.02.2007
ES01.06.2007
[2008/23]
Former [2008/15]DK21.02.2007
ES01.06.2007
Cited inInternational search[A]DE4335297  (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH) [A] 1,5-9 * claims 1-8 *;
 [D]WO9610507  ;
 [AD]WO8910921  (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND CO) [AD] 1,6-8 * siehe Seite 37, Zeilen 26-27; SEite 39, Zeilen 25-26; Seite 41, Zeilen 24-25; Seite 43, Zeilen 26-27; Seite 45, Zeilen 26-27; Seite 47, Zeilen 25-26; Seite 53, * * Zeilen 26-27; Seite 55, Zeilen 25-26; Ansprüche 1-3, 6, 11-13, 16, 21-23, 26, 30 *;
 [A]WO9410154  (HOECHST AG) [A] 1,5-9 * claim - *;
 [A]DE4439675  (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH) [A] 1,5-9 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0496701  (CIBA-GEIGY AG) [A] 1,5-9 * claim - *;
 [PA]DE19616445  (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH) [PA] 1,5-9 * claim - *