Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975905

EP0975905 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION PISTON ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAN B & W Diesel A/S
Teglholmsgade 41
2450 Copenhagen SV / DK
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSEN, Erling, Bredal
Skt. Ibsalle 90
DK-2630 Taastrup / DK
02 / MOCZULSKI, Lech
Klydevej 16
DK-2650 Hvidovre / DK
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Munk, Ludwig
Patentanwälte Munk
Prinzregentenstrasse 3
86150 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1
86150 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date98904152.028.01.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998EP00442
Priority number, dateDE199711575816.04.1997         Original published format: DE 19715758
[2000/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846914
Date:22.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975905
Date:02.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975905
Date:14.05.2003
Language:DE
[2003/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16J9/12
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:HUBKOLBENBRENNKRAFTMASCHINE[2000/05]
English:INTERNAL COMBUSTION PISTON ENGINE[2000/05]
French:MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A PISTON ALTERNATIF[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase01.10.1999National basic fee paid 
01.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
22.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2003Fee for grant paid
03.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB14.05.2003
NL14.05.2003
SE14.08.2003
[2004/22]
Former [2004/02]NL14.05.2003
SE14.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE14.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2124332  (SULZER AG) [X] 1 * page 2, line 13 - line 20; figures 2,3 *;
 [AD]WO9412815  (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DK]) [AD] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantWO9412815