Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971894

EP0971894 - NICOTINAMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.01.2006
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARFAT, Anthony
333 Lantern Hill Road
Mystic, CT 06355 / US
02 / CHAMBERS, Robert, James
25 Clipper Drive
Mystic, CT 06355 / US
03 / WATSON, John, Wesley
13 Cranwood Road
Ledyard, CT 06339 / US
04 / CHENG, John, Bin
5 Farmstead Lane
Waterford, CT 06385 / US
05 / DUPLANTIER, Allen, Jacob
431 Pumpkin Hill Road
Ledyard, CT 06339 / US
06 / KLEINMAN, Edward, Fox
16 Roseridge Court
Pawcatuck, CT 06379 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Laurent, Claire
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Laurent, Claire
Pfizer European Pharma Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Former [2002/49]Laurent, Claire
Pfizer Global Research & Development 3-9,rue de la Loge BP 100
94265 Fresnes Cedex / FR
Former [2000/03]McMunn, Watson Palmer
Pfizer Limited Patents Department Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date98904343.510.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998IB00315
Priority number, dateUS19970043403P04.04.1997         Original published format: US 43403 P
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845268
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971894
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D213/82, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D405/14, C07D409/12, C07D409/14, C07D413/12, C07D417/14, A61K31/44
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
Extension statesAL04.10.1999
LT04.10.1999
LV04.10.1999
MK04.10.1999
RO04.10.1999
SI04.10.1999
TitleGerman:NICOTINAMID-DERIVATE[2000/03]
English:NICOTINAMIDE DERIVATIVES[2000/03]
French:DERIVES DE NICOTINAMIDE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase04.10.1999National basic fee paid 
04.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
22.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2005
14.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/11]
24.10.2005Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.01.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]US4861891  (SACCOMANO NICHOLAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,19 * abstract *;
 [X]US4270946  (GUTMAN ARNOLD D) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]US4692185  (MICHAELY WILLIAM J [US]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]US4251263  (GUTMAN ARNOLD D) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]FR2639185  (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1 * see page 17, compound I; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0053011  (MAY & BAKER LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * see page 48, formula (XI);; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0550900  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0500989  (LACER SA [ES]) [X] 1 * see page 10, compounds no. 15, 16, 17;; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]FR2140772  (ARIES ROBERT) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]FR2197872  (DYNACHIM SARL [FR]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [X]DE2706977  (HOECHST AG) [X] 1 * page 14, line 6 - line 10 * * page 16, line 16 - line 20 *;
 [X]DE2720926  (HOECHST AG) [X] 1 * see page 5, second formula ("sulfonamide") and page 4, definitions of substituents *;
 [X]EP0661274  (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP]) [X] 1 * see page 30, compound no. 144 *;
 [X]JPH07304775
 [X]  - F. J. VINICK ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 86 - 9, XP002066969 [X] 1-4 * page 87 - page 88 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00105a015
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 96, no. 3, [X] 1 * see formula III *