Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1013735

EP1013735 - ANAEROBICALLY HARDENABLE SEALING COMPOUND COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.10.2002  [2002/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THREE BOND CO., LTD.
1456, Hazama-cho Hachioji-shi
Tokyo 193-0941 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
THREE BOND CO., LTD.
1456, Hazama-cho
Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0941 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HOSOKI, Satoshi, c/o Three Bond Co., Ltd.
1456 Hazama-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0942 / JP
 [2001/30]
Former [2000/26]01 / HOSOKI, Satoshi, Grandtale-Kunugida 103
533-15, Kunugida-cho
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0942 / JP
Representative(s)Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98904397.120.02.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998JP00701
Priority number, dateJP1997007643420.02.1997         Original published format: JP 7643497
[2000/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9837161
Date:27.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1013735
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1013735
Date:10.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/41]
Search report(s)International search reportJP27.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09K3/10, C09J175/16, C09J4/06, C08F290/06, C08L75/16
[2000/36]
Former International [2000/26]C09K3/10, C09J175/16, C09J4/06, C08F290/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/26]
TitleGerman:ANAEROBISCH HÄRTBARE DICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2000/26]
English:ANAEROBICALLY HARDENABLE SEALING COMPOUND COMPOSITION[2000/26]
French:COMPOSITION A BASE DE COMPOSE D'ETANCHEITE DURCISSABLE PAR VOIE ANAEROBIE[2000/26]
Entry into regional phase05.08.1999Translation filed 
05.08.1999National basic fee paid 
05.08.1999Search fee paid 
05.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
05.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/26]
31.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.05.2001Fee for grant paid
25.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH06287410  ;
 [A]US4223099  (VON HARPE HANNES, et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, [A] 1-6 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH04117474  (OKURA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD);
 [A]JPS5665065  (LOCTITE CORP);
 [A]JPS50133286