EP1003606 - ALKYLPOLYGLYCOSIDE CONTAINING SURFACTANT BLENDS FOR EMULSION POLYMERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200 Gulph Mills Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 2500 Renaissance Boulevard, Suite 200 Gulph Mills, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLIMA, Rudolph 328 Richardson Road Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | 02 /
PIPPIN, Wallace, H. 201 Royal View Drive West Chester, PA 19382 / US | 03 /
NATALE, Marcie 553 Zinn Drive Southampton, PA 18966 / US | 04 /
HOPKINS, Thomas, R. 52 Applecross Circle Chalfont, PA 18914 / US | 05 /
FEUSTEL, Dieter Lottanstrasse 31 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 06 /
FENG, Ching 137 Jordan Road Brookline, MA 02146 / US | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd, et al Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Fabry, Bernd, et al Cognis GmbH Postfach 13 01 64 40551 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Fabry, Bernd, Dr., et al Cognis Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2000/22] | Weber, Thomas, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 98904594.3 | 02.02.1998 | [2000/22] | WO1998US00988 | Priority number, date | US19970037046P | 03.02.1997 Original published format: US 37046 P | US19970051145P | 27.06.1997 Original published format: US 51145 P | US19970069803P | 15.12.1997 Original published format: US 69803 P | US19980009432 | 20.01.1998 Original published format: US 9432 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9833876 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1003606 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01F17/42, B01F17/56, C08F218/08, C08F220/18, B01F17/00, C08F2/24 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C08F2/24 (EP,US);
C11D3/16 (KR);
C09K23/56 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/22] | B01F17/42, B01F17/56, C08F218/08, C08F220/18 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | TENSIDMISCHUNGEN ENTHALTEND ALKYLPOLYGLYCOSIDE ZUR EMULSIONSPOLYMERISATION | [2000/22] | English: | ALKYLPOLYGLYCOSIDE CONTAINING SURFACTANT BLENDS FOR EMULSION POLYMERIZATION | [2000/22] | French: | MELANGES DE TENSIOACTIFS CONTENANT DES ALKYLPOLYGLYCOSIDES POUR POLYMERISATION EN EMULSION | [2000/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.1999 | Search fee paid | 27.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 23.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/37] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9203527 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-3,12-15* page 3, paragraph 2; claims 1-19 * | International search | [A]US3714096 (BIALE G); | [A]US4767625 (MITSUNO YUICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US5073591 (TSAUR SHENG-LIANG [US]); | [A]US5542950 (COLE HOWARD [US], et al); | [A]US5556573 (WEUTHEN MANFRED [DE], et al) |