Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979429

EP0979429 - MULTIPLE PACK ACTIVE DEVICE RECEPTACLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  28.01.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul
Minnesota 55133 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SELLI, Raman, K.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / PARRETT, George, W.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2000/07]Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98904686.702.02.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998US01454
Priority number, dateUS1997079202904.02.1997         Original published format: US 792029
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9834141
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979429
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998
[2000/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/38
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/07]
TitleGerman:VIELFACHSTECKERBUCHSEN MIT AKTIVEN KOMPONENTEN[2000/07]
English:MULTIPLE PACK ACTIVE DEVICE RECEPTACLES[2000/07]
French:CONNECTEUR MULTICONNEXION A COMPOSANTS ACTIFS[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase31.07.1999National basic fee paid 
31.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
18.01.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/11]
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5452388  (RITTLE JEFFREY W [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 14, line 1 - column 16, line 37 *;
 [Y]EP0610676  (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 23 *;
 [Y]JPS5890607  ;
 [PY]EP0788002  (MOLEX INC [US]) [PY] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 19 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 12 *;
 [Y]JPS63307408  ;
 [Y]EP0374136  (AMP INC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 19 *;
 [A]US5381498  (BYLANDER JAMES R [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [Y]JPS57142607  ;
 [Y]US4135783  (KUNZE DIETER) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 4 * * column 6, lines 26-52 *;
 [Y]US4756591  (FISCHER KARL [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * column 3, lines 58-68 * * column 4, lines 33-59 *;
 [Y]JPH0926529  ;
 [Y]DE3508627  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 18 *;
 [A]US4277135  (SCHROTT WERNER G, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - YASUHIRO ANDO ET AL, "ADVANCED OPTICAL CONNECTORS FOR SINGLE-MODE FIBERS", NTT REVIEW, (19910501), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 110 - 121, XP000240402 [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 113, column R, line 5 - page 114, column R, line 9 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830823), vol. 007, no. 192, Database accession no. (P - 218), [Y] 1 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890407), vol. 013, no. 141, Database accession no. (P - 853), [Y] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821203), vol. 006, no. 245, Database accession no. (P - 159), [Y] 1,2,4-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - SHIMADA J -I ET AL, "INTEGRATED COUPLING DEVICE BETWEEN A LASER DIODE AND AN OPTICAL FIBER USING A MICROLENS", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, (19940801), vol. 77, no. 8, pages 45 - 53, XP000504926 [Y] 1,2,4-6 * page 46, column L, line 7 - column R, line 16; figure 1 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 097, no. 005, [Y] 1,2,4-6 * abstract *