Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0968161
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2001509806Global Dossier 24.07.2001A
Priority number Date
US3632897 31.01.1997
US9801619 29.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0968161Global Dossier 29.08.2001B1
EP0968161 05.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
US3632897 31.01.1997
US9801619 29.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69801489T 23.05.2002T2
DE69801489D 04.10.2001D1
Priority number Date
US3632897 31.01.1997
US9801619 29.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US5945573 31.08.1999A
Priority number Date
US3632897 31.01.1997
US540098 09.01.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6093859 25.07.2000A
Priority number Date
US32373699 01.06.1999
US3632897 31.01.1997
US540098 09.01.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9833756Global Dossier 06.08.1998A1
Priority number Date
US3632897 31.01.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2162417T 16.12.2001T3
Priority number Date
US3632897 31.01.1997