Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968161

EP0968161 - PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SIEVERT, Allen, Capron
215 Rhett Lane
Elkton, MD 21921 / US
02 / NAPPA, Mario, Joseph
3 Oakridge Court
Newark, DE 19711 / US
03 / RAO, V., N., Mallikarjuna
1 Georgetown Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Matthews, Derek Peter
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Matthews, Derek Peter
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date98904726.129.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US01619
Priority number, dateUS19970036328P31.01.1997         Original published format: US 36328 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9833756
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968161
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968161
Date:29.08.2001
Language:EN
[2001/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07C17/25, C07C17/354, C07C19/08
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUORPROPAN[2000/01]
English:PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPANE[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE 1,1,1,3,3-PENTAFLUOROPROPANE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase05.07.1999National basic fee paid 
05.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
27.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.02.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2001Fee for grant paid
08.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI29.08.2001
[2002/15]
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0703207  (DAIKIN IND LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [PX]JPH0967281  ;
 [PX]JPH0995459
 [PX]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 20, Database accession no. 97-221713, XP002061480 & JPH0967281 A 19970311 (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [PX] 1-10 * abstract *
 [PX]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 24, Database accession no. 97-267720, XP002061481 & JPH0995459 A 19970408 (DAIKIN KOGYO KK) [PX] 1-10 * abstract *