Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015559

EP1015559 - HUMAN REGENERATION-ASSOCIATED SERPIN-1 (RASP-1) AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hepatix, Inc.
Suite 100, 3344 N. Torrey Pines Court
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
Hepatix, Inc.
Suite 100, 3344 N. Torrey Pines Court
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PURCHIO, Anthony, F.
Cardiff, CA / US
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/27]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98904837.603.02.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US01962
Priority number, dateUS19970036842P03.02.1997         Original published format: US 36842 P
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9833890
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015559
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/08, C07K14/81
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:SERPIN-1 (RASP-1), EINHERGEHEND MIT REGENERIERUNG, SOWIE ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN[2000/27]
English:HUMAN REGENERATION-ASSOCIATED SERPIN-1 (RASP-1) AND METHODS OF USE[2000/27]
French:SERFINE-1 (RASP-1) ASSOCIEE A LA REGENERATION HUMAINE ET METHODES D'UTILISATION[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase03.09.1999National basic fee paid 
03.09.1999Search fee paid 
03.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
18.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/27]
23.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]WO9639540  (ADVANCED TISSUE SCIENCES INC [US])
 [X]  - NEW L., ET AL., "CDNA CLONING OF RASP-1, A NOVEL GENE ENCODING A PLASMA PROTEIN ASSOCIATED WITH LIVER REGENERATION.", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, US, (19960614), vol. 223., no. 02., doi:10.1006/bbrc.1996.0906, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 404 - 412., XP002913409

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.0906