EP0958293 - NANOMOLAR, NON-PEPTIDE INHIBITORS OF CATHEPSIN D [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 300 Lakeside Drive 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KICK, Ellen, K. 1310 Marin Avenue Albany, CA 94706 / US | 02 /
ELLMAN, Jonathan, A. 5450 Masonic Avenue Oakland, CA 94618 / US | 03 /
KUNTZ, Irwin, D. 55 Almemar Drive Greenbrae, CA 94904 / US | 04 /
LEE, Christina, E. Apartement 3 1530 Arch Street Berkeley, CA 94708 / US | 05 /
LIU, Guangcheng 1133 9th Street G Albany, CA 94710 / US | 06 /
ROE, Diana, C. 5206 Ramsgate Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | 07 /
SKILLMAN, A., Geoffrey 149 Ripley Street San Francisco, CA 94110-5261 / US | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98904934.1 | 03.02.1998 | [1999/47] | WO1998US02199 | Priority number, date | US19970036903P | 04.02.1997 Original published format: US 36903 P | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9833795 | Date: | 06.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0958293 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0958293 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, A61K31/41, C07D413/14, C07D263/58, C07D209/48, C07D317/58 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
C07D209/48 (EP,US);
A61K31/36 (EP,US);
A61K31/4035 (EP,US);
A61K31/423 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D263/58 (EP,US);
C07D317/58 (EP,US);
C07D317/60 (EP,US);
C07D317/62 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/47] | Title | German: | NANOMOLARE, NON-PEPTIDISCHE INHIBITOREN VON CATHEPSIN D | [1999/47] | English: | NANOMOLAR, NON-PEPTIDE INHIBITORS OF CATHEPSIN D | [1999/47] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE CATHEPSINE D NANOMOLAIRES ET NON PEPTIDIQUES | [1999/47] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Request for further processing for: | 19.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 19.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.01.2005 | BE | 19.01.2005 | CH | 19.01.2005 | FI | 19.01.2005 | LI | 19.01.2005 | NL | 19.01.2005 | IE | 03.02.2005 | LU | 03.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | DK | 19.04.2005 | GR | 19.04.2005 | SE | 19.04.2005 | ES | 30.04.2005 | PT | 19.06.2005 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
NL | 19.01.2005 | ||
IE | 03.02.2005 | ||
LU | 03.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
ES | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
NL | 19.01.2005 | ||
IE | 03.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
ES | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
NL | 19.01.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
ES | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
GR | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
ES | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
CH | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
LI | 19.01.2005 | ||
DK | 19.04.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
ES | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 19.01.2005 | |
BE | 19.01.2005 | ||
FI | 19.01.2005 | ||
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 19.01.2005 | |
SE | 19.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 19.01.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9208700 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1-46* pages 120-124; claim 1 *; | [PX] - E. K. KICK ET AL., "Structure-based design and combinatorial chemistry yield low nanomolar inhibitors of cathepsin D", CHEMISTRY & BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 297 - 307, XP002065985 [PX] 1-46 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(97)90073-9 | [A] - GETMAN D P ET AL, "DISCOVERY OF A NOVEL CLASS OF POTENT HIV-1 PROTEASE INHIBITORS CONTAINING THE (R)-(HYDROXYETHYL)UREA ISOSTERE", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (19930122), vol. 36, pages 288 - 291, XP000644498 [A] 1-46 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00054a014 |