Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973888

EP0973888 - DENDRITIC CELL-DERIVED GROWTH FACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC.
9110 Key West Avenue
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Human Genome Sciences, Inc.
9110 Key West Avenue
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FAN, Ping
Apartment 302 West Side Drive
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
02 / SOPPET, Daniel, R.
15050 Stillfield Place
Centreville, VA 22020 / US
03 / LI, Yi
1247 Lakeside Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
04 / DILLON, Patrick, J.
1055 Snipe Court
Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/04]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98904981.205.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US02329
Priority number, dateUS19970038829P06.02.1997         Original published format: US 38829 P
[2000/40]
Former [2000/04]US19970003882P06.02.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835039
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973888
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C07K14/475, C07K16/22, A61K38/18, C12Q1/68
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VON DENDRITISCHEN ZELLEN ABGELEITETEN WACHSTUMSFAKTOR[2000/04]
English:DENDRITIC CELL-DERIVED GROWTH FACTOR[2000/04]
French:FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE DERIVE DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES[2000/04]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase06.09.1999National basic fee paid 
06.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
07.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/08]
21.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9528479  (KLINIKUM DER ALBERT-LUDWIGS-UNIVERSITÄT FREIBURG) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9118620  (NEW YORK UNIVERSITY; SLOAN-KETTERING INST. FOR CANCER RESEARCH) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - EMBL, EMSTS, Entry Hs193191, Accession number G10193, (19950817), XP002065540 [X] 10,11,18 * abstract *
 [X]  - EMBL, EMINV, Entry CeC15c7, Accession number U41528, (19951209), XP002065541 [X] 10,11,18 * abstract *
 [DA]  - MOHAMADZADEH M ET AL, "DENDRITIC CELLS PRODUCE MACROPHAGE INFLAMMATORY PROTEIN-1 GAMMA, A NEW MEMBER OF THE CC CHEMOKINE FAMILY", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19960501), vol. 156, no. 9, pages 3102 - 3106, XP000673480 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - K. HOMMA ET AL., "PURIFICATION, CHARACTERIZATION, AND cDNA CLONING OF A NOVEL GROWTH FACTOR FROM THE CONDITIONED MEDIUM OF HIH-SAPE-4, AN EMBRYONIC CELL LINE OF SARCOPHAGE PEREGRINA (FLESH FLY)", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 271, pages 13770 - 13775, XP002065539 [AD] 1-21 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.23.13770