Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0966606

EP0966606 - AIR ASSIST FUEL INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Automotive Corporation
2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills
Michigan 48326-2980 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]For all designated states
Siemens Automotive Corporation
2400 Executive Hills Drive
Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NALLY, Debora, E.
2270 W. Island Road
Williamsburg, VA 23185 / US
02 / BOYLAN, John
100 Glascow Way
Hampton, VA 23662 / US
[1999/52]
Representative(s)Allen, Derek , et al
Siemens Group Services Limited
Intellectual Property Department
Siemens House
Oldbury, Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/52]Allen, Derek , et al
Siemens Group Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB
Application number, filing date98905087.712.02.1998
[1999/52]
WO1998US02892
Priority number, dateUS1997081628513.03.1997         Original published format: US 816285
[1999/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840624
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0966606
Date:29.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[1999/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0966606
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:F02M69/04, F02M69/08
[1999/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/52]
TitleGerman:PNEUMATISCH UNTERSTÜTZTE BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZDÜSE[1999/52]
English:AIR ASSIST FUEL INJECTOR[1999/52]
French:INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT A ASSISTANCE PNEUMATIQUE[1999/52]
Entry into regional phase12.08.1999National basic fee paid 
12.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/52]
10.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2002Fee for grant paid
01.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DY]US5174505  (SHEN JINGMING J [US]) [DY] 1-3,7-11 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 63; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0682179  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-3,7-11 * column 6, line 55 - column 8, line 22; figure - *;
 [A]US5360166  (NOGI TOSHIHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5553790  (FINDLER GUENTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *