blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0968473

EP0968473 - METHOD FOR MODELLING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS AND SIMULATION OF FLUID FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  04.11.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2015Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 02.12.2015  [2015/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLDFLOW PTY. LTD.
259-261 Colchester Road
Kilsyth, VIC 3137 / AU
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Hua, Gang
19 Tortice Drive
Ringwood North, VIC 3134 / AU
02 / THOMAS, Roland
10 Sedgemeadow Road
Wayland, MA 01778 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechsanwälte
Steinerstraße 15/Haus A
81369 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/49]Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Steinerstrasse 15/A
81369 München / DE
Former [2008/38]Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36
81479 München / DE
Former [2006/14]Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42
D-81479 München / DE
Former [2000/01]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date98905149.527.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998AU00130
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0574620.03.1997         Original published format: AU PO574697
US1997093212517.09.1997         Original published format: US 932125
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9843179
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968473
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968473
Date:20.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/16]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0968473
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2001
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/13, G06F17/50, B29C33/00, B29C45/02, B29C45/76, G06T17/20
[2001/29]
CPC:
G06T17/20 (EP); B29C45/7693 (EP); G06F30/23 (EP);
B29C33/3842 (EP); G06F2111/10 (EP); G06F2113/22 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/01]G06F17/13, G06F17/50, B29C33/00, B29C45/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2015/49]
Former [2000/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM MODELLIEREN VON DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTEN UND SIMULATION VON FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRÖMUNG[2004/35]
English:METHOD FOR MODELLING THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS AND SIMULATION OF FLUID FLOW[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE MODELISATION D'OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS ET SIMULATION D'UN ECOULEMENT DE FLUIDE[2000/01]
Former [2000/01]VERFAHREN ZUM MODELLIEREN VON DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTEN UND SIMULATIOM VON FLÜSSIGKEITSSTROM
Entry into regional phase10.09.1999National basic fee paid 
10.09.1999Search fee paid 
10.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
10.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
14.08.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2005Fee for grant paid
17.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.01.2006  30.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
SIMPOE SAS
1, allée Emile Cohl
77200 TORCY / FR
Opponent's representative
Derambure, Christian
Derambure Conseil
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75009 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2014/25]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2006  30.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
SIMPOE SAS
1, allée Emile Cohl
77200 TORCY / FR
Opponent's representative
Derambure, Christian
DERAMBURE Conseil
52 rue de la Victoire
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2010/19]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2006  30.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
SIMPOE SAS
1, allée Emile Cohl
77200 TORCY / FR
Opponent's representative
Derambure, Christian
DERAMBURE Conseil Conseil en Propriété Industrielle 14 avenue d'Eylau
75116 Paris / FR
Former [2009/42]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2006  30.01.2006  ADMISSIBLE
SIMPOE SAS
1, allée Emile Cohl
77200 TORCY / FR
Opponent's representative
Novagraaf IP
3 Avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Former [2006/10]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2006   
SIMPOE SAS
1, allée Emile Cohl
77200 TORCY / FR
Opponent's representative
Breese Derambure Majerowicz
38, avenue de l'Opéra
75002 Paris / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/30]
27.02.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.09.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2007Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.12.2008Date of oral proceedings
09.02.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.02.2009Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
18.03.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.03.2015Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
31.07.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
26.10.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition06.04.2009Appeal received No.  T0756/09
09.06.2009Statement of grounds filed
18.03.2015Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
18.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
01.04.2015Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
GB27.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
IE27.02.2007
AT27.02.2010
FI27.02.2010
IT27.02.2010
ES28.02.2010
FR01.03.2010
PT27.08.2010
NL01.09.2010
[2015/21]
Former [2011/35]BE20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
GB27.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
IE27.02.2007
AT27.02.2010
FI27.02.2010
IT27.02.2010
FR01.03.2010
PT27.08.2010
NL01.09.2010
ES24.03.2011
Former [2011/25]BE20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
GB27.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
IE27.02.2007
AT27.02.2010
FI27.02.2010
IT27.02.2010
FR01.03.2010
PT27.08.2010
NL01.09.2010
Former [2008/15]BE20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
GB27.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
IE27.02.2007
Former [2007/29]BE20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
GB27.02.2006
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2007/17]BE20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
LU28.02.2006
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/44]BE20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
MC28.02.2006
Former [2006/14]BE20.04.2005
CH20.04.2005
LI20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
GR20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
Former [2006/13]BE20.04.2005
DK20.07.2005
SE20.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE20.07.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0698467  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,23-25,28,32 * abstract *;
 [A]  - DEITZ DAN, "Optimizing injection-molded parts", MECH ENG;MECHANICAL ENGINEERING OCT 1996, (199610), vol. 118, no. 10, pages 89 - 90, XP000996910 [A] 1,23-25,28,32 * the whole document *
International search[X]  - "SOFTWARE LETS MOLDERS MAKE EVERY SHOT COUNT", MACHINE DESIGN., PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH., US, US, (19970206), ISSN 0024-9114, pages 46 - 50, XP000996907
 [X]  - LEE Y-G, LEE K, "SHELL MESH GENERATION BY MEDIAL AXIS TRANSFORMATION", COMPUTERS IN ENGINEERING AND PROCEEDINGS OF THE DATABASESYMPOSIUM, XX, XX, XX, (19950101), pages 713 - 727, XP001004772
 [X]  - HIMASEKHAR K., LOTTEY J., WANG K. K., "CAE OF MOLD COOLING IN INJECTION MOLDING USING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL NUMERICAL SIMULATION.", TRANSACTIONS OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS,SERIES B: JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING FOR INDUSTRY., ASME. NEW YORK., US, US, (19920501), vol. 114., no. 02., ISSN 0022-0817, pages 213 - 221., XP000298165
 [X]  - YAMAMOTO S, ET AL., "UNSTEADY THERMAL ANALYSIS OF AN INJECTION MOLD BY THE BOUNDARY-ELEMENT METHOD", HEAT TRANSFER, JAPANESE RESEARCH, SCRIPTA TECHNICS, NEW YORK, NY,, US, US, (19920101), vol. 21, no. 07, ISSN 0096-0802, pages 666 - 677, XP001004794
OppositionUS5189626
 US5439622
 US5572434
    - L. S. TURNG ET AL., "On the Simulation of Microelectronic Encapsulation with Epoxy Molding Compound", ANTEC'92, pages 84 - 88
    - "Development of a radial flow analysis for injection molding" (Kazmer), published October 1991
    - R-Y CHANG ET AL., Integral Consitutive Model, MUNICH, HANSER PUBLISHERS, (1994), pages 365 - 372
    - W. F. ZOETELIEF, Multi-component Injection Moulding, DEN HAAG, CIP-DATA KONINKLIJKE BIBLIOTEK, (1995), pages 1 - 127
    - J. KOPLIK, "Creeping flow in two-dimensional networks", JOURNAL FLUID MECH., (1982), vol. 119, pages 219 - 247
    - M. A. IOANNIDIS ET AL., "Network modelling of pore structure and transport properties of porous media", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 48, no. 5, pages 951 - 972
    - D. DING ET AL., "Finite element simulation of an injection moulding process", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL FOR NUMERICAL, (1997), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 751 - 766
    - R-Y- CHANG ET AL., "A Unified K-BKZ Model for Residual Stress Analysis of Injection Molded Three-Dimensional Thin Shapes", POLYMER ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE, (199511), vol. 35, no. 22, pages 1733 - 1747
    - L.F.A. DOUVEN ET AL., The computation of properties of injection-moulded products, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., (1995), vol. 20, pages 403 - 457
    - D.C. CONSTABLE ET AL., "Three dimensional bi-component extrusion simulations by the boundary element method", COMPUTATIONAL MECHANICS, (1995), vol. 16, pages 114 - 123
    - Y.-E. YOO ET AL., "Numerical simulation of the resin transfer mode filling process using the boundary element method", POLYMER COMPOSITES, (1996), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 368 - 374
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.