Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973870

EP0973870 - METHODS FOR SELECTING GERM-LINE COMPETENT CELLS IN CHICKEN EMBRYOS, AND THE USE OF THE CELLS IN THE PRODUCTION OF CHIMERAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.01.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF GUELPH
Room 214, Reynolds Building Guelph
Ontario N1G 2W1 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF GUELPH
Room 214, Reynolds Building
Guelph, Ontario N1G 2W1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / ETCHES, Robert, J., Uni. of Guelph
Off.the vice-p resident Research
Guelph, Ontario N1G 2W1 / CA
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Benedum, Ulrich Max
Haseltine Lake LLP
Theatinerstrasse 3
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Benedum, Ulrich Max
Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Benedum, Ulrich Max, Dr.
Haseltine Lake Partners Motorama Haus 502 Rosenheimer Strasse 30
81669 München / DE
Application number, filing date98905172.727.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998CA00145
Priority number, dateUS19970039488P28.02.1997         Original published format: US 39488 P
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838283
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973870
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/06, A01K67/027
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:METHODEN ZUR SELEKTION VON KEIMBAHN-KOMPETETEN ZELLEN IN HÜHNEREMBRYOS UND VERWENDUNG DER ZELLEN ZUR HERTSTELLUNG VON CHIMEREN[2000/04]
English:METHODS FOR SELECTING GERM-LINE COMPETENT CELLS IN CHICKEN EMBRYOS, AND THE USE OF THE CELLS IN THE PRODUCTION OF CHIMERAS[2000/04]
French:PROCEDES DE SELECTION DE CELLULES COMPETENTES DE LIGNEES GERMINALES DANS DES EMBRYONS DE POULETS ET UTILISATION DE CES CELLULES DANS LA PRODUCTION DE CHIMERES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
21.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/11]
13.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0710439  (NAT INST ANIMAL IND [JP]) [X] 1 * p. 2, lines 26 - 34; p. 3, lines 24-26 * [Y] 1-19;
 [DX]  - PETITTE, J.N. & KARAGENÇ, L., "growth factors during early events in avian embryo development", POULTRY AND AVIAN BIOLOGY REVIEWS, (1996), vol. 7, no. 2/3, pages 75 - 87, XP002069537 [DX] 1-8,10-13,16-19 * pages 80; page 81, left-hand column *
 [Y]  - KARAGENÇ, L. ET AL., "Origin of primordial germ cells in the prestreak chick embryo", DEVELOPMENTAL GENETICS, (1996), vol. 19, pages 290 - 301, XP002069538 [Y] 1-19 * whole disclosure *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1520-6408(1996)19:4<290::AID-DVG2>3.0.CO;2-4
 [DY]  - ETCHES, R.J. ET AL., "Chimeric chickens and their use in manipulation of the chicken genome", POULTRY SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 72, pages 882 - 889, XP002069539 [DY] 9 * figure 1 *