Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968162

EP0968162 - 5-HYDROXYALKYL SUBSTITUTED PHENYLS AND THEIR USE IN MEDICAMENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ARTERIOSCLEROSIS AND HYPERLIPOPROTEINAEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  30.11.2001
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2001Refusal of applicationpublished on 16.01.2002  [2002/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / MÜLLER-GLIEMANN, Matthias
Laibacherstrasse 10
D-42697 Solingen / DE
02 / ANGERBAUER, Rolf
Moospfad 20
D-42113 Wuppertal / DE
03 / BRANDES, Arndt
Pahlkestrasse 5
D-42115 Wuppertal / DE
04 / LÖGERS, Michael
Niederradenberg 15
D-42327 Wuppertal / DE
05 / SCHMECK, Carsten
Hosfelds Katernberg 2
D-42113 Wuppertal / DE
06 / SCHMIDT, Gunter
Pahlkestrasse 63
D-42115 Wuppertal / DE
07 / BREMM, Klaus-Dieter
Eberhardstrasse 20
D-45661 Recklinghausen / DE
08 / BISCHOFF, Hilmar
Am Rohm 78
D-42113 Wuppertal / DE
09 / SCHMIDT, Delf
Am Eckbusch 55 b
D-42113 Wuppertal / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98905338.423.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP00361
Priority number, dateDE199710424405.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19704244
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9834895
Date:13.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968162
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search reportEP13.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07C33/50, C07C43/178, C07C49/83, C07C33/46, A61K31/045, A61K31/075, A61K31/12
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:5-HYDROXY-ALKYL SUBSTITUIERTE PHENYLE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN ARZNEIMITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ARTERIOSKLEROSE UND HYPERLIPOPROTEINEMIE[2000/01]
English:5-HYDROXYALKYL SUBSTITUTED PHENYLS AND THEIR USE IN MEDICAMENTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF ARTERIOSCLEROSIS AND HYPERLIPOPROTEINAEMIA[2000/01]
French:PHENYLES SUBSTITUES PAR 5-HYDROXY-ALKYLE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES MEDICAMENTS POUR TRAITER L'ARTERIOSCLEROSE ET L'HYPERLIPOPROTEINEMIE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase06.09.1999National basic fee paid 
06.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
01.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
20.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/03]
30.07.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AD]US5169857  (ANGERBAUER ROLF [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * claim - *;
 [AD]EP0325130  (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * claim - *