Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1016325

EP1016325 - MICROWAVE OVEN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2007
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.12.2007  [2007/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
2000 M-63 Benton Harbor
Michigan 49022 / US
[2007/01]
Former [2000/27]For all designated states
WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION
2000 M-63
Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RISMAN, P., O.
Sandsjön 4480
S-438 92 Härryda / SE
02 / CARLSSON, Dan
Skepparegatan 37B
S-602 27 Norrköping / SE
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A.
Patent Department
Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Guerci, Alessandro
Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27
21025 Comerio (VA) / IT
Application number, filing date98905388.903.02.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998EP00553
Priority number, dateSE1997000044810.02.1997         Original published format: SE 9700448
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835533
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1016325
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1016325
Date:03.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:H05B6/80
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:MIKROWELLENOFEN[2000/27]
English:MICROWAVE OVEN[2000/27]
French:FOUR A MICRO-ONDES[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase17.06.1999National basic fee paid 
17.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
27.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2006Fee for grant paid
20.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]US2814708  (JUDD BLASS) [X] 1,2,5 * column 3, line 11 - line 15 *;
 [X]US3991295  (AKIYOSHI MITSUO) [X] 1 * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 1 *;
 [X]DE1515149  (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [PX]WO9744988  (IMPLICO BV [NL], et al) [PX] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]GB944993  (RADYNE LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 88 - page 2, line 6 *;
 [A]US3943318  (HIRAI KAZUMI);
 [A]GB1114938  (HIRST MICROWAVE HEATING LTD);
 [A]DE8900624U  (N.V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN)