Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968300

EP0968300 - DEGRADATION OF BIOLOGICALLY DEGRADABLE POLYMERS USING ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.2009
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 25.01.2017  [2017/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshøjvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[N/P]
Former [2006/36]For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KOCH, Rainhard
Rybnikerstrasse 12
D-51065 Köln / DE
02 / LUND, Henrik
Norrebrogade 63,3
DK-2200 Kopenhagen N / DK
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98905396.204.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP00585
Priority number, dateDE199710602317.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19706023
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9836086
Date:20.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968300
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968300
Date:05.03.2008
Language:DE
[2008/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12P7/62, C12P1/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ABBAU VON BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBAREN POLYMEREN MIT ENZYMEN[2000/01]
English:DEGRADATION OF BIOLOGICALLY DEGRADABLE POLYMERS USING ENZYMES[2000/01]
French:DECOMPOSITION DE POLYMERES BIODEGRADABLES AVEC DES ENZYMES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase17.09.1999National basic fee paid 
17.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
13.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.01.2008Fee for grant paid
14.01.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.12.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07]
Request for further processing for:16.11.2005Request for further processing filed
16.11.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.12.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
17.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK05.03.2008
FI05.03.2008
SE05.06.2008
[2017/04]
Former [2009/08]DK05.03.2008
FI05.03.2008
SE05.06.2008
Former [2008/46]FI05.03.2008
SE05.06.2008
Former [2008/39]FI05.03.2008
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9426812  (CRAY VALLEY SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [X]JPH05344897  ;
 JPH0920857  [ ] (CHIKYU KANKYO SANGYO GIJUTSU, et al);
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 05, Database accession no. 94-039714, XP002900061 & JPH05344897 A 00000000 (AMANO PHARM KK) [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - CHIKYU KANKYO SANGYO GIJUTSU K., "Biodegradable, flexible polymer compositions", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19970421), vol. 126, no. 16, Database accession no. 212899, XP002900072 [X] 1-7 * abstract *
 [X]  - R.-J. MÜLLER, "Mechanistic Studies on the Biodegradation of Polyester", MONOGRAPHS, HAMBURG, DE, (1996), vol. 133, XP002900064 [X] 1-7 * page 209 - page 211 * * page 214, paragraph L - page 215, paragraph 1 *
 [PX]  - M. MOCHIZUKI ET AL., "Classification of Aliphatic Polyesters", POLYMERS FOR ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, (199704), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 203 - 209, XP002900065 [PX] 1-7 * page 203 - page 209 * * page 207, column L, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1099-1581(199704)8:4<203::AID-PAT627>3.3.CO;2-V