Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969931 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969931



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 115
27.05.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 1
03.04.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
13.02.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.08.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.08.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.02.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
02.02.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
02.02.2001 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.01.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
01.12.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.11.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.11.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.06.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
25.06.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 25
25.06.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
17.05.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
25.11.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
29.10.1998 Priority document Search / examination 22
04.08.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
04.08.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 24