Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0969931


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.05.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.07.2002  [2002/29]
03.04.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
08.02.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
23.08.2001 Examination report or reply
02.03.2001 Renewal fee
13.02.2001 Examination report or reply
28.11.2000 Examination report or reply
21.07.2000 First examination report
17.07.2000 Examination report or reply
06.03.2000 Renewal fee
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
26.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
22.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
06.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication