Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969931

EP0969931 - EX-SITU PRESULPHIDED HYDROCARBON CONVERSION CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.07.2002  [2002/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
Inventor(s)01 / ADAMS, Charles, Terrell
739 Bison
Houston, TX 77079 / US
02 / CHEN, Andrew, An-Ju
12231 Gladewick Drive
Houston, TX 77077 / US
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98905416.806.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP00722
Priority number, dateUS1997079702107.02.1997         Original published format: US 797021
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9834728
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969931
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:B01J37/20, B01J37/12
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:AUS-SITU VORSULFIDIERTER KATALYSATOR FÜR DIE UMWANDLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN[2000/02]
English:EX-SITU PRESULPHIDED HYDROCARBON CONVERSION CATALYSTS[2000/02]
French:CATALYSEURS DE CONVERSION D'HYDROCARBONES PRESULFURES EX-SITU[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase25.06.1999National basic fee paid 
25.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
20.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/29]
13.02.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]FR1349022  (THE BRITISH PETROLEUM) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0707890  (EURECAT EUROP RETRAIT CATALYS) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 12 * * page 3, line 58 - page 4, line 9 * * claim - *;
 [A]EP0002272  (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO);
 [A]EP0181254  (EURECAT EUROP RETRAIT CATALYS)