Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973429

EP0973429 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A FROTHED LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.05.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROCEP LUSOL HOLDINGS LIMITED
Rocep Business Park, Kings Inch Road Deanpark
Renfrew PA4 8XY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
ROCEP LUSOL HOLDINGS LIMITED
Rocep Business Park, Kings Inch Road
Deanpark, Renfrew PA4 8XY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / FRUTIN, Bernard, Derek
Jaapston Farm, Uplawmoor
Renfrewshire G78 3BL / GB
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Murnane, Graham John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Murnane, Graham John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date98905533.019.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998GB00533
Priority number, dateGB1997000348219.02.1997         Original published format: GB 9703482
GB1997001459311.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9714593
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9836671
Date:27.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973429
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973429
Date:03.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:A47J43/12, B65D79/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesAL02.09.1999
LT02.09.1999
LV02.09.1999
MK02.09.1999
RO02.09.1999
SI02.09.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER GESCHÄUMTEN FLÜSSIGKEIT[2000/04]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING A FROTHED LIQUID[2000/04]
French:PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN LIQUIDE MOUSSANT[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase02.09.1999National basic fee paid 
02.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
03.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2002Fee for grant paid
08.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.07.2002
BE03.07.2002
CH03.07.2002
FI03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
LI03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
IE19.02.2003
LU19.02.2003
MC28.02.2003
[2005/21]
Former [2005/02]AT03.07.2002
BE03.07.2002
CH03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
LI03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
IE19.02.2003
LU19.02.2003
MC28.02.2003
Former [2004/39]AT03.07.2002
BE03.07.2002
CH03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
LI03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
IE19.02.2003
LU19.02.2003
Former [2004/15]AT03.07.2002
BE03.07.2002
CH03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
LI03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
IE19.02.2003
Former [2004/04]AT03.07.2002
BE03.07.2002
CH03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
LI03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2003/48]AT03.07.2002
BE03.07.2002
CH03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
LI03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/46]AT03.07.2002
CH03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
LI03.07.2002
DK03.10.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/31]AT03.07.2002
CH03.07.2002
GR03.07.2002
LI03.07.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/22]GR03.07.2002
PT03.10.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/20]GR03.07.2002
SE03.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE03.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US3868978  (KNOPF KARL HORST) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 35; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0078789  (TEICH AG FOLIENWALZWERK [AT]) [Y] 10-14 * column 3, line 15 - column 7, line 17; figure - *;
 [Y]EP0360375  (GUINNESS SON & CO LTD A [IE]) [Y] 10-14 * column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 34; figure - *;
 [AD]WO9633618  (SCOTTISH & NEWCASTLE PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0520602  (GUINNESS BREWING WORLDWIDE [GB]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 40 - column 4, line 39 *