Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970547

EP0970547 - COAXIAL CONNECTOR FOR CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.12.2002
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BOZZER, Dieter
Avenue de la Gare 47
CH-1880 Bex / CH
02 / KEMPTER, Sébastien
Chemin Pré-d'Emoz 39
CH-1860 Aigle / CH
03 / RITHENER, Blaise
Avenue de la Prairie 9bis
CH-1800 Vevey / CH
04 / THOMAS, Lionel
Rue du Village
CH-1967 Bramois / CH
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach (SG) / CH
Application number, filing date98905591.818.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998IB00381
Priority number, dateGB1997000615525.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9706155
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843323
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970547
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970547
Date:20.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01R24/02, H01R9/05, H01R12/16
[2001/24]
Former International [2000/02]H01R17/12, H01R9/05, H01R23/68
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:KOAXIALVERBINDER FÜR GEDRUCKTE SCHALTUNGEN[2000/02]
English:COAXIAL CONNECTOR FOR CIRCUIT BOARD[2000/02]
French:CONNECTEUR AXIAL POUR CARTE A CIRCUITS IMPRIMES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
31.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.07.2001Fee for grant paid
31.07.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)21.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[PXY]WO9718603  (THE WHITAKER CORPORATION) [PX] 1-3,5-10 [Y] 4;
 [YA]US5180315  (M. NAGASHIMA) [Y] 4 [A] 1-3,5-10;
 [A]EP0722202  (THE WHITAKER CORPORATION) [A] 1-10;
 [A]US5688130  (S.-S. HUANG) [A] 1-10;
 [A]US5145382  (D.M. DICKIRSON) [A] 1-10;
 [A]EP0647985  (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY, LIMITED) [A] 1-10