Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978563

EP0978563 - DELTA 9-DESATURASE GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.10.2012  [2012/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Suntory Holdings Limited
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8203 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]For all designated states
Suntory Holdings Limited
1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8203 / JP
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SUNTORY LIMITED
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SHIMIZU, Sakayu
6-9, Tokiwayamashita-cho Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 616-8212 / JP
02 / KOBAYASHI, Michihiko
Royal Center Bld. Room 307, 97 Joudojishimobabacho
Sakyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8413 / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/24]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2000/06]Marsh, Roy David
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98905692.427.02.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998JP00819
Priority number, dateJP1997004430327.02.1997         Original published format: JP 4430397
[2000/06]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838314
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978563
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978563
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2002
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/52, C12N15/63, C12N15/80, C12N1/15
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:DELTA-9 DESATURASE GEN[2000/06]
English:DELTA 9-DESATURASE GENE[2000/06]
French:GENE DE DELTA 9-DESATURASE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase27.08.1999Translation filed 
27.08.1999National basic fee paid 
27.08.1999Search fee paid 
27.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
27.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
27.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
27.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2009Fee for grant paid
14.05.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
21.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
22.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
23.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.07.2009
BE01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
IT01.07.2009
NL01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
GR02.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
IE27.02.2010
LU27.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
[2012/43]
Former [2011/25]AT01.07.2009
BE01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
IT01.07.2009
NL01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
GR02.10.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
IE27.02.2010
MC01.03.2010
Former [2010/28]AT01.07.2009
BE01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
NL01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
Former [2010/19]AT01.07.2009
FI01.07.2009
NL01.07.2009
SE01.07.2009
ES12.10.2009
PT02.11.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0561569  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [X] 3,5,7,9,19-23 * the whole document *;
 [PX]  - LAOTENG K. ET AL., "CLONING OF A COLD-INDUCED GENE ENCODING STEAROYL-CoA DESATURASE FROM MUCOR ROUXII", DATABASE EMBL, (19971105), XP002187615 [PX] 1-23 * 62.864% identity in 412 aa overlap with SEQ ID NO: 4 *
 [XY]  - MEESTERS P.A.E.P. ET AL., "DELTA-9 FATTY ACID DESATURASE GENE (Ole1) FROM CRYPTOCOCCUS CURVATUS ATCC 20509", DATABASE EMBL, (19970113), XP002187616 [X] 3,5,7,19 * 56.103% identity in 426 aa overlap with SEQ ID NO: 4 * [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-18,20-23
 [XY]  - MEESTERS P.A.E.P. ET AL., "DELTA-9 FATTY ACID DESATURASE GENE (Ole1) FROM CRYPTOCOCCUS CURVATUS CBS 570", DATABASE EMBL, (19970113), XP002187617 [X] 3,5,7,19 * 55.634% identity in 426 aa overlap with SEQ ID NO: 4 * [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-18,20-23
 [XY]  - GARGANO S. ET AL., "DELTA-9 FATTY ACID DESATURASE GENE (Ole1) FROM HISTOPLASMA CAPSULATUM (STRAIN G217B)", DATABASE EMBL, (19950330), XP002187618 [X] 3,5,7,19 * 55.556% identity in 423 aa overlap with SEQ ID NO: 4 * [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-18,20-23
 [XY]  - GARGANO S. ET AL., "DELTA-9 FATTY ACID DESATURASE GENE (Ole1) FROM HISTOPLASMA CAPSULATUM (STRAIN DOWNS)", DATABASE EMBL, (19950330), XP002187619 [X] 3,5,7,19 * 54.588% identity in 425 aa overlap with SEQ ID NO: 4 * [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-18,20-23
 [XY]  - STUKEY J. E. ET AL., "SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE DELTA-9 FATTY ACID DESATURASE (OLE1) GENE", DATABASE EMBL, (19940318), XP002187620 [X] 3,5,7,19 * 46.753% idetity in 385 aa overlap with SEQ ID NO: 4 * [Y] 1,2,4,6,8-18,20-23
 [Y]  - SHIMIZU S. ET AL., "PRODUCTION OF POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACIDS BY FILAMENTOUS FUNGI", VITAMINS, (1992), vol. 66, no. 5-6, pages 289 - 299, XP001026963 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - SHIMIZU S. ET AL., "PRODUCTION OF USEFUL FATTY ACIDS BY MICROBIOL PROCESSES", RECENT RES. DEV. LIPIDS RES., (1997), vol. 1, pages 267 - 286, XP001026965 [Y] 1-23 * the whole document *
International search[XP]  - MEESTERS P.A.E.P. et al., "Cloning and Expression of the delta-9 Fatty Desaturase Gene from Cryptococus Curvatus ATCC 20509 Containing Histidine Boxes and a Cytochrome beta5 Domain", APPL. MICROBOL. BIOTECHNOL., (Aug. 1997), Vol. 47, p. 663-667,, XP002910631
 [X]  - PATRICIA A. E. P. M., EGGINK G., "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION A DELTA-9 FATTY ACID DESATURASE GENEFROM THE OLEAGINOUS YEAST CRYPTOCOCCUS CURVATUS CBS 570.", Yeast, John Wiley & Sons Ltd., GB, GB, (19960101), vol. 12., doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0061(19960630)12:8<723::AID-YEA963>3.0.CO;2-O, ISSN 0749-503X, pages 723 - 730., XP002910630

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0061(19960630)12:8<723::AID-YEA963>3.0.CO;2-O
 [X]  - GARGANO S., ET AL., "A TEMPERATURE-SENSITIVE STRAIN OF HISTOPLASMA CAPSULATIUM HAS AN ALTERED DELTA 9-FATTY ACID DESATURASE GENE.", Lipids, Springer, DE, DE, (19950101), vol. 30., no. 10., doi:10.1007/BF02537480, ISSN 0024-4201, pages 899 - 906., XP002910629

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02537480
 [X]  - STUKEY J. E., ET AL., "THE OLE1 GENE OF SACCHAROMYCES CEREVISIAE ENCODES THE DELTA 9 FATTYACID DESATURASE AND CAN BE FUNCTIONALLY REPLACED BY THE RAT STEAROYL-COA DESATURASE GENE.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19901125), vol. 265., no. 33., ISSN 0021-9258, pages 20144 - 20149., XP002910628
 [X]  - NTAMBI J. M., ET AL., "DIFFERENTIATION-INDUCED GENE EXPRESSION IN 3T3-L1 PREADIPOCYTES CHARACTERIZATION OF A DIFFERENTIALLY EXPRESSED GENE ENCODING STEAROYL-COA DESATURASE.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19881125), vol. 263., no. 33., ISSN 0021-9258, pages 17291 - 17300., XP002910627
 [A]  - SHIMIZU S., ET AL., "SESAMIN IS A POTENT AND SPECIFIC INHIBITOR OF DELTA5 DESATURASE IN POLYUNSATURATED FATTY ACID BIOSYNTHESIS.", Lipids, Springer, DE, DE, (19910101), vol. 26., no. 07., doi:10.1007/BF02536595, ISSN 0024-4201, pages 512 - 516., XP002910626

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02536595