Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0974651 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0974651



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 572
14.11.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.10.2003 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
17.07.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no declaration of maintenance of the application/non-reply to the Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
25.03.2003 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.03.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.03.2003 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
18.09.2002 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
14.08.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.08.2002 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
26.07.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.06.2002 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
04.06.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
25.05.2001 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Annex Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
14.06.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.02.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
15.02.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
08.02.2000 Sequence listing Search / examination 33
15.12.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.12.1999 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 3
28.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
28.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
28.09.1999 Description Search / examination 103
28.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 12
28.09.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.04.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
10.12.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 100
02.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 134
25.08.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
25.08.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 138