Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0974651


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
31.10.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.12.2003  [2003/51]
11.07.2003 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
21.03.2003 Supplementary search report published on  07.05.2003  [2003/19]
12.03.2003 Renewal fee
26.07.2002 Change - applicant published on  11.09.2002  [2002/37]
26.07.2002 Change - inventor published on  11.09.2002  [2002/37]
21.03.2002 Renewal fee
24.05.2001 Change - applicant published on  11.07.2001 [2001/28]
09.03.2001 Renewal fee
07.04.2000 Change - applicant published on  24.05.2000 [2000/21]
09.03.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
25.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.12.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication