Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974651

EP0974651 - PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE PROTEIN ORIGINATING IN MAMMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2003
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nakamura, Yusuke
17-33, Azamino 1-chome, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 225-0011 / JP
For all designated states
Tanaka, Toshihiro
4-8-401, Shiroganedai 4-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0071 / JP
For all designated states
Tsukada, Shuichi
c/o Pharm. Front. Research Laboratories of Japan Tobacco, Inc. 13-2, Fukuura 1-chome, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Nakamura, Yusuke
17-33, Azamino 1-chome, Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 225-0011 / JP
For all designated states
Tanaka, Toshihiro
4-8-401, Shiroganedai 4-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0071 / JP
For all designated states
Tsukada, Shuichi
c/o Pharm. Front. Research Laboratories of Japan Tobacco, Inc. 13-2, Fukuura 1-chome, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
Former [2001/28]For all designated states
Center for Advanced Science and Technology Incubation, Ltd
Shin-Marunouchi Building, 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Nakamura, Yusuke
17-33, Azamino 1-chome, Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 225-0011 / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Japan Tobacco Inc.
2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2002/37]
Former [2000/04]01 / NAKAMURA, Yusuke
17-33, Azamino 1-chome Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 225-0011 / JP
02 / TANAKA, Toshihiro
4-8-401, Shiroganedai 4-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0071 / JP
03 / TSUKADA, Shuichi, Pharm. Front. Res. Lab.
Jap. Tobac., Inc 13-2, Fukuura 1-chm. Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/04]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98905706.227.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998JP00835
Priority number, dateJP1997006225928.02.1997         Original published format: JP 6225997
JP1998006226325.02.1998         Original published format: JP 6226398
[2000/04]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838305
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974651
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/12, C12P21/02, C12P21/08, A61K38/17, C07K14/47, C07K19/00, C07K16/18, C07K14/705, A01K67/027
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:PHYSIOLOGISCH AKTIVES PROTEIN AUS SÄUGETIEREN.[2000/04]
English:PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE PROTEIN ORIGINATING IN MAMMALS[2000/04]
French:PROTEINE PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVE PROVENANT DE MAMMIFERES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase28.09.1999Translation filed 
28.09.1999National basic fee paid 
28.09.1999Search fee paid 
28.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
28.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
05.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/51]
17.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]  - TANAKA T. ET AL., "Isolation of novel genes related to endothelial proliferation by differential mRNA display method", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, (1996), vol. 59, no. 4, page A161, XP001088488 [X] 1-14 * abstract *
 [X]  - (19961121), Database accession no. AA119754, URL: EMBL, EBI, XP002205599 [X] 1 * abstract *
 [PX]  - (19970418), Database accession no. AA375655, URL: EMBL, EBI, XP002205600 [PX] 1 * abstract *
 [PX]  - (19970312), Database accession no. AA245169, URL: EMBL, EBI, XP002205601 [PX] 1 * abstract *
 [PX]  - EMBL, (19970504), Database accession no. AA409021, URL: EBI, XP002232604 [PX] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - STRADER C D ET AL, "STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION OF G PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTORS", ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOCHEMISTRY, PALTO ALTO, CA, US, (1994), vol. 63, ISSN 0066-4154, pages 101 - 132, XP001041816

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.bi.63.070194.000533
 [A]  - AUTIERI M V ET AL, "USE OF DIFFERENTIAL DISPLAY TO IDENTIFY DIFFERENTIALLY EXPRESSED MRNAS INDUCED BY RAT CAROTID ARTERY BALLOON ANGIOPLASTY", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES AND CANADIAN ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY, BALTIMORE,, US, (199506), vol. 72, no. 6, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 656 - 661, XP001088486
 [A]  - WANG X ET AL, "TEMPORAL EXPRESSION OF ECE-1, ET-1, ET-3, ETA, AND ETB RECEPTOR MRNAS AFTER BALLOON ANGIOPLASTY IN THE RAT", JOURNAL OF CARDIOVASCULAR PHARMACOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1995), vol. 26, no. SUPPL 3, ISSN 0160-2446, pages S22 - S25, XP001088487
International search[X]  - ADAMS M. D., ET AL., "INITIAL ASSESSMENT OF HUMAN GENE DIVERSITY AND EXPRESSION PATTERNS BASED UPON 83 MILLION NUCLEOTIDES OF CDNA SEQUENCE.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19950928), vol. 377., ISSN 0028-0836, pages 03 - 17., XP002914403
 [X]  - LEE N. H., ET AL., "COMPARATIVE EXPRESSED-SEQUENCE-TAG ANALYSIS OF DIFFERENTIAL GENE EXPRESSION PROFILES IN PC-12 CELLS BEFORE AND AFTER NERVE GROWTH FACTOR TREATMENT.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19950101), vol. 92., doi:10.1073/pnas.92.18.8303, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8303 - 8307., XP002914404

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.18.8303
 [A]  - AUTIER M. V., PRYSTOWSKY M. B., OHLSTEIN E. H., "ISOLATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF BART-1: A NOVEL BALLOON ANGIOPLASTY RESPONSIVE TRANSCRIPT IN RATE CAROTID ARTERIES.", DNA AND CELL BIOLOGY, MARY ANN LIEBERT, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, (19960101), vol. 15., no. 04., ISSN 1044-5498, pages 297 - 304., XP002914405