Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972525

EP0972525 - PREVENTIVES AND REMEDIES FOR HYPERPHOSPHATEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8514 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NOMURA, Kazuhiko
2-2-7, Showadai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0815 / JP
02 / SASAKI, Emiko
2-13-7, Higashitanabe, Higashisumiyoshi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 546-0032 / JP
03 / NAKAZI, Kazumi
4-3-21-503, Zuikou, Higashiyodogawa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 533-0005 / JP
04 / KAJIHO, Tokuaki
2-13-10, Seiwadai, Kita-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-1121 / JP
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Türk - Gille - Hrabal - Struck
Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98905796.305.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998JP00933
Priority number, dateJP1997006403418.03.1997         Original published format: JP 6403497
[2000/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841237
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972525
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K45/00, A61K31/435, C07D471/04, A61K31/50, A61P13/12, A61P5/00
[2000/48]
Former International [2000/03]A61K45/00, A61K31/435, C07D471/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VORBEUGENDE UND HEILENDE MITTEL GEGEN HYPERPHOSPHATÄMIE[2000/03]
English:PREVENTIVES AND REMEDIES FOR HYPERPHOSPHATEMIA[2000/03]
French:MEDICAMENTS POUR LA PREVENTION ET LA THERAPIE DE L'HYPERPHOSPHATEMIE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1999Translation filed 
08.09.1999National basic fee paid 
08.09.1999Search fee paid 
08.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
08.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
14.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/34]
22.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5296490  (SHIOKAWA YOUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 *cf. col. 1, lines 10-22, lines 43 bridging with col. 2, lines 1-10*;
 [Y]EP0497258  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-10 *cf. page 2,lines 19 bridging with page 3, lines 1-5*;
 [Y]EP0516941  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-10 *cf. abstract, page 2, lines 3-37, formula (I)*;
 [Y]WO9518128  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 *cf. abstract, pp. 1-3*;
 [Y]US5204346  (SHIOKAWA YOUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 *cf. abstract, cols. 1 and 2(lines 1-37)*;
 [Y]EP0379979  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-10 *cf. page 2, lines 3-23, and formula (I), page 5, formula (Ig)*
International search[A]JPH07228534  (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK);
 [A]JPH08512281