Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968305

EP0968305 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DETECTION OR QUANTIFICATION OF NUCLEIC ACID SPECIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.02.2005  [2005/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HYSEQ, INC.
575 Maude Court
Sunnyville, CA 94086 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / DRMANAC, Radoje
850 East Greenwich Place
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date98905956.314.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US00704
Priority number, dateUS1997078474716.01.1997         Original published format: US 784747
US1997081295104.03.1997         Original published format: US 812951
US1997089250314.07.1997         Original published format: US 892503
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9831836
Date:23.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968305
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM NACHWEIS ODER ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN[2000/01]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DETECTION OR QUANTIFICATION OF NUCLEIC ACID SPECIES[2000/01]
French:PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR DETECTION OU QUANTIFICATION DES ESPECES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase21.07.1999National basic fee paid 
21.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
03.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
03.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9617957  (HYSEQ INC) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0721016  (AFFYMAX TECH NV) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9509248  (ARCH DEV CORP ;DRMANAC RADOJE (US)) [X] 1-33 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9411530  (UNIV BOSTON) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DONG-JING FU ET AL, "A DNA SEQUENCING STRATEGY THAT REQUIRES ONLY FIVE BASES OF KNOWN TERMINAL SEQUENCE FOR PRIMING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (19951024), vol. 92, no. 22, pages 10162 - 10166, XP000602286 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BROUDE N E ET AL, "ENHANCED DNA SEQUENCING BY HYBRIDIZATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (199404), vol. 91, pages 3072 - 3076, XP000619675 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.8.3072
 [A]  - CANTOR C R ET AL, "THE FUTURE OF DNA SEQUENCING METHODS AND APPLICATIONS", MASS SPECTROMETRY IN THE BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (1996), pages 519 - 533, XP000602992 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *
 [A]  - DRMANAC R ET AL, "REQUIREMENTS IN SCREENING CDNA LIBRARIES FOR NEW GENES AND SOLUTIONS OFFERED BY SBH TECHNOLOGY", IDENTIFICATION OF TRANSCRIBED SEQUENCES. PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, (1994), pages 239 - 251, XP000671141 [A] 1-33 * the whole document *