Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021745

EP1021745 - HOLOGRAPHIC DEVICE FOR FORMATION OF LIGHT BEAMS WITH PREDETERMINED SPECTRAL COMPOSITIONS AND PROJECTOR OF VIDEO IMAGES CONTAINING SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.04.2004  [2004/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
CORNING INCORPORATED
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAHMANI, Brahim
5 bis, rue Gabriel Peri
F-92120 Montrouge / FR
02 / GALPERN, Alexander
Nalichnaiy 36-2-ap. 100
St.Petersburg, 199976 / RU
03 / SUKHANOV, Vitaly I.
ul. Sovetskaya, 6-13-5
St.Petersburg, 193130 / RU
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Boon, Graham Anthony
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Boon, Graham Anthony
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date98906137.903.02.1998
[2000/30]
WO1998US02144
Priority number, dateFR1997000144407.02.1997         Original published format: FR 9701444
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9835264
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1021745
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021745
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/32, G02F1/1335, H04N9/31
[2000/51]
Former International [2000/30]G02F1/1335, G02B5/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/30]
TitleGerman:HOLOGRAPHISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR FORMUNG VON LICHTSTRAHLEN MIT VORHERBESTIMMTER SPEKTRALER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND EIN UBER EINE SOLCHE VORRICHTUNG VERFUGENDER PROJEKTOR VON VIDEOBILDERN[2000/30]
English:HOLOGRAPHIC DEVICE FOR FORMATION OF LIGHT BEAMS WITH PREDETERMINED SPECTRAL COMPOSITIONS AND PROJECTOR OF VIDEO IMAGES CONTAINING SUCH A DEVICE[2000/30]
French:DISPOSITIF HOLOGRAPHIQUE POUR FORMER DES FAISCEAUX LUMINEUX AYANT DES COMPOSITIONS SPECTRALES PREDETERMINEES, ET PROJECTEUR D'IMAGES VIDEO COMPORTANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase07.07.1999National basic fee paid 
07.07.1999Search fee paid 
07.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/30]
01.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2003Fee for grant paid
29.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US5267060  (COLTON RUSSELL F [US]) [A] 1,15 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 13 *;
 [A]EP0166194  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9015367  (FIRST HOLOGRAPHICS LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 12 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5172222  (PLANTIER DENIS [FR], et al) [A] 1,15 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 9 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US4040726  (PACA FRANCIS B) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 58 - column 6, line 64 *
International search[A]US4715683  (GREGORY DON A [US], et al);
 [A]US4807978  (GRINBERG JAN [US], et al);
 [A]US5117296  (HOEBING JOHN L [US]);
 [A]US5404234  (TANIGUCHI NAOSATO [JP], et al)