blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973536

EP0973536 - RESTENOSIS/ATHEROSCLEROSIS DIAGNOSIS, PROPHYLAXIS AND THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PASTEUR MERIEUX SERUMS ET VACCINS
58, avenue Leclerc
69007 Lyon / FR
For all designated states
THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Box 13, 6011 Executive Boulevard
Rockville, MD 20752 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
PASTEUR MERIEUX SERUMS ET VACCINS
58, avenue Leclerc
69007 Lyon / FR
For all designated states
THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, Box 13, 6011 Executive Boulevard
Rockville, MD 20752 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EPSTEIN, Stephen, E.
11700 Danville Drive
Rockville, MD 20852 / US
02 / FINKEL, Toren
5011 Delray Avenue
Bethesda, MD 20814 / US
03 / SPEIR, Edith
7701 Arlen Street
Annandale, VA 22003 / US
04 / ZHOU, Yi, Fu
9020 Old Georgetown Road
Bethesda, MD 20814 / US
05 / ZHU, Jianhui
4949 Battery Lane 405
Bethesda, MD 20814 / US
06 / ERDILE, Lorne
1 Locust Lane
Loudonville, NY 12211 / US
07 / PINCUS, Steven
78 Troy Road
East Greenbush, NY 12061 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2002/30]Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance, et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Gros, Florent
Pasteur Merieux Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 58, Avenue Leclerc
F-69007 Lyon / FR
Application number, filing date98906152.805.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US02191
Priority number, dateUS1997079610105.02.1997         Original published format: US 796101
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9833510
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973536
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US06.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.08.2001
ClassificationIPC:A61K38/00, A61K39/245, A61K39/25, A61K39/295
[2000/04]
CPC:
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US); A61K39/001151 (EP,US); A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P9/10 (EP); C07K14/005 (EP,US); C07K14/4746 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US); A61K2039/58 (EP,US); A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US); C12N2710/14143 (EP,US); C12N2710/16122 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16134 (EP,US); C12Q2600/156 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSE DER RESTENOSE/ATHERIOSKLEROSE, PROPHYLAXE UND THERAPIE[2000/04]
English:RESTENOSIS/ATHEROSCLEROSIS DIAGNOSIS, PROPHYLAXIS AND THERAPY[2000/04]
French:DIAGNOSTIC DE LA RESTENOSE/ATHEROSCLEROSE, PROPHYLAXIE ET TRAITEMENT[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase06.09.1999National basic fee paid 
06.09.1999Search fee paid 
06.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
29.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/50]
17.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]  - HOLZMAN D C, "Cytomegalovirus and restenosis.", MOLECULAR MEDICINE TODAY, (1996 JUL) 2 (7) 270., (199607), XP000993432 [A] * the whole document *
International search[Y]US5534258  (GOLUBEV DANIEL B [US], et al);
 [Y]  - MELNICK J. L., ADAM E., DEBAKEY M. E., "CYTOMEGALOVIRUS AND ATHEROSCLEROSIS.", BIOESSAYS, John Wiley & Sons Ltd., GB, GB, (19950101), vol. 17., doi:10.1002/bies.950171012, ISSN 0265-9247, pages 899 - 903., XP002911146

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bies.950171012
 [A]  - VERCELLOTTI G. M., "POTENTIAL ROLE OF VIRUSES IN THROMBOSIS AND ATHEROSCLEROSIS.", TRENDS IN CARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY., US, US, (19950701), vol. 05., no. 04., doi:10.1016/1050-1738(95)00052-B, ISSN 1050-1738, pages 128 - 133., XP002911147

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1050-1738(95)00052-B
 [A]  - SPEIR E., ET AL., "POTENTIAL ROLE OF HUMAN CYTOMEGALOVIRUS AND P53 INTERACTION IN CORONARY RESTENOSIS.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19940715), vol. 265., doi:10.1126/science.8023160, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 391 - 394., XP002911148

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8023160
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.