Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015482

EP1015482 - ISOLATED CANDIDA ALBICANS OLIGOPEPTIDE TRANSPORTER GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.04.2005  [2005/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF TENNESSEE RESEARCH CORPORATION
415 Communications Building
Knoxville, TN 37996-0344 / US
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / BECKER, Jeffrey, M.
7125 Cresthill Drive
Knoxville, TN 37919 / US
02 / LUBKOWITZ, Mark, A. Univ. of Tennessee Research
Microbiology Dept. M409 Walters Building
Knoxville, TN 37996-0334 / US
 [2004/02]
Former [2000/27]01 / BECKER, Jeffrey, M.
7125 Cresthill Drive
Knoxville, TN 37919 / US
02 / LUBKOWITZ, Mark, A. Univ. of Tennessee Research
Microbiology Dept. M409 WaltersBuilding
Knoxville, TsN 37996-0334 / US
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre , et al
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Breese, Pierre , et al
Breese - Majerowicz 3, avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98906199.906.02.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998US02332
Priority number, dateUS19970037859P07.02.1997         Original published format: US 37859 P
[2000/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9834950
Date:13.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015482
Date:05.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search reportUS13.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.07.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/40, C12N15/31, C12N15/80
[2004/37]
Former International [2000/27]C07K14/40, C12N15/31
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/27]
TitleGerman:ISOLIERTES CANDIDA ALBICANS OLIGOPEPTIDTRANSPORTER GEN[2000/27]
English:ISOLATED CANDIDA ALBICANS OLIGOPEPTIDE TRANSPORTER GENE[2000/27]
French:GENE TRANSPORTEUR D'OLIGOPEPTIDES ISOLES DE CANDIDA ALBICANS[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase31.08.1999National basic fee paid 
31.08.1999Search fee paid 
31.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
30.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
22.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2000
29.02.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[PX]  LUBKOWITZ M A ET AL, "OLIGOPEPTIDE TRANSPORT GENE FROM CANDIDA ALBICANS", MICROBIOLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, READING, GB, (199702), vol. 143, no. 2, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 387 - 396, XP000929716 [PX] 1-24 * the whole document *
    [] LUBKOWITZ, M., ET AL, "Candida albicans oligopeptide transporter (OPT1) gene, complete cds", DATABASE EMBL, Database accession no. U60973, URL: CANDIDA ALBICANS, XP002288510 [ ] * column A *
 [DY]  BASRAI MUNIRA ET AL, "Cloning of a Candida albicans peptide transport gene", MICROBIOLOGY (READING), (1995), vol. 141, no. 5, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 1147 - 1156, XP008032809 [DY] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1155, column L, paragraph 2 *
 [DY]  BASRAI M A ET AL, "Toxicity of oxalysine and oxalysine-containing peptides against Candida albicans: regulation of peptide transport by amino acids.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY. NOV 1992, (199211), vol. 138 ( Pt 11), ISSN 0022-1287, pages 2353 - 2362, XP001156051 [DY] 1-24 * abstract * * page 2360, column L, paragraph 2 *
International search[X]  - FEI Y.-J., ET AL., "EXPRESSION CLONING OF A MAMMALIAN PROTON-COUPLED OLIGOPEPTIDE TRANSPORTER.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19940407), vol. 368., doi:10.1038/368563a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 563 - 566., XP002910589

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/368563a0
 [X]  - FLING M. E., ET AL., "ANALYSIS OF A CANDIDA ALBICANS GENE THAT ENCODES A NOVEL MECHANISM FOR RESISTANCE TO BENOMYL AND METHOTREXATE.", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS., SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN., DE, DE, (19910101), vol. 227., doi:10.1007/BF00259685, ISSN 0026-8925, pages 318 - 329., XP002910590

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00259685