Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975462

EP0975462 - THERMAL INSULATING COATING EMPLOYING MICROENCAPSULATED PHASE CHANGE MATERIAL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.06.2007  [2007/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRIANGLE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION
414 Hillsborough Street
Raleigh, NC 26703 / US
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / BRYANT, Yvonne, G.
316 Lord Berkley Road
Raleigh, NC 27610 / US
02 / COLVIN, David, P.
123 Harmony Hill Lane
Cary, NC 27513 / US
03 / DRISCOLL, John, C.
7800 Netherlands Drive
Cary, NC 27502 / US
04 / MULLIGAN, James, C.
912 Indian Trail
Raleigh, NC 27609 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Warren, Anthony Robert , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Warren, Anthony Robert , et al
BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date98906339.113.02.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US02674
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9941067
Date:19.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975462
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.1999
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:B32B9/00
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:WÄRMEISOLATIONSBESCHICHTUNG MIT VERWENDUNG VON MIKROGEKAPSELTEM PHASENVERÄNDERUNGSMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN[2000/05]
English:THERMAL INSULATING COATING EMPLOYING MICROENCAPSULATED PHASE CHANGE MATERIAL AND METHOD[2000/05]
French:REVETEMENT D'ISOLATION THERMIQUE UTILISANT UN MATERIAU A CHANGEMENT DE PHASE MICROENCAPSULE ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Search fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
01.03.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/25]
09.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200609   M06   Not yet paid
28.02.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5290904
 [Y]US5532039
 [Y]US5677048