Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980480

EP0980480 - ELECTRONIC AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEM WITH BRAKE WEAR MEASUREMENT, RUNNING CLEARANCE ADJUSTMENT AND PLURAL ELECTRIC MOTOR-ACTUATOR RAM ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2004  [2004/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/34]For all designated states
Goodrich Corporation
Four Coliseum Centre, 2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, North Carolina 28217 / US
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY
9921 Brecksville Road
Brecksville, Ohio 44141-3289 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RALEA, Mihai
7 Spruce Court
Boonton Township, NJ 07005 / US
02 / CHRIST, Franklin, C.
375 Boulevard
Pompton Plains, NJ 07444 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98906382.113.02.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998US02764
Priority number, dateUS1997085351309.05.1997         Original published format: US 853513
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850711
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980480
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980480
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Search report(s)International search reportEP12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16D66/02, F16D65/16, F16D65/56, F16D55/36, B60T13/74
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/08]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES FLUGZEUGBREMSSYSTEM MIT VERSCHLEISSMESSUNG, SPIELNACHSTELLUNG UND MEHREREN ELEKTROMOTOR-BETÄTIGUNGSEINHEITEN[2000/08]
English:ELECTRONIC AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEM WITH BRAKE WEAR MEASUREMENT, RUNNING CLEARANCE ADJUSTMENT AND PLURAL ELECTRIC MOTOR-ACTUATOR RAM ASSEMBLIES[2000/08]
French:SYSTEME DE FREINAGE ELECTRONIQUE POUR AVION, AVEC MESURE DE L'USURE DES FREINS, AJUSTEMENT DU JEU FONCTIONNEL ET PLUSIEURS ENSEMBLES VERINS DE COMMANDE DU MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase07.01.1999National basic fee paid 
07.01.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.01.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
05.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2003Fee for grant paid
24.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02023513.1  / EP1279854
Opposition(s)03.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XAY]DE3032558  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 1-3,13-15,21,38-40,43,44 * the whole document * [A] 5-7,23,25 [Y] 10,12;
 [DXAY]US4995483  (MOSELEY DOUGLAS D [US], et al) [DX] 23,25,38,43,45 * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 42; figure - * [A] 1,4,8,13,19,21,22 [Y] 10,12;
 [XA]JPH0345462  ;
 [XA]DE19536695  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 23,25 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 53; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,8,13,19,21-23,25,38,43;
 [X]DE3444301  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 23,25,38,41,43,45 * figure .; claims 1-7 *;
 [DY]US4865162  (MORRIS RICK [US], et al) [DY] 27,30-35 * column A * * column 5, line 37 - line 67 *;
 [Y]US4712441  (ABRAHAM WILLIAM F [US]) [Y] 27,30-35 * column 5, line 7 - line 45; figures 1,3 * * column 9, line 3 - line 18; figure 10 *;
 [A]US4474060  (CROSSMAN RICHARD L [US]) [A] 36 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 17 * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 27; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0643290  (SUDHOP HELMUTH [DE], et al) [A] 36,37 * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 22; figures 12,13 *;
 [A]EP0703133  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1,4,8,13,21,23,25,38,41,43 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9533933  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,6,7,13,17,18,21 * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 2 * * page 28, line 13 - page 29, line 2 * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]WO9300525  (RANCOURT CLAUDE [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,13-15,21,23,24,38,42,43 * page 1, line 5 - page 18, line 1; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US5339069  (PENNER WESLEY [CA], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 4 - line 3; figure 11 * * column A *;
 [A]DE19519948  (BEIKIRCH INDUSTRIEELEKTRONIK G [DE]) [A] 27,28,30-33 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0526273  (BENDIX ALTECNA SPA [IT]) [A] 27,30-33 * column 2, line 23 - line 45; figure . *;
 [A]US4503946  (DAVIDSON DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 27,30 * column A; figure - *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910514), vol. 15, no. 186, Database accession no. (M - 1112), [X] 23-26 * abstract * [A] 1,8,9,13,19-22,38,43