Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009395

EP1009395 - BAK PROMOTOR EXPRESSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.02.2016
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.02.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.03.2016  [2016/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
[2015/15]
Former [2001/30]For all designated states
Tanox, Inc.
10301 Stella Link
Houston, TX 77025 / US
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
LXR BIOTECHNOLOGY INC.
3095 Richmond Parkway, Suite 213
Richmond, California 94806 / US
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
LXR BIOTECHNOLOGY INC.
1401 Marina Way South
Richmond, CA 94804 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KIEFER, Michael, C.
401 Wright Court
Clayton, CA 94517 / US
02 / OSSINA, Natasha
555 Pierce Street 1041
Albany, CA 94706 / US
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/16]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2010/32]Wright, Andrew John , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2004/26]Pilkington, Stephanie Joan , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2000/25]Bassett, Richard Simon , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date98906429.017.02.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998US02845
Priority number, dateUS19970038412P18.02.1997         Original published format: US 38412 P
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835659
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009395
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009395
Date:15.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47, A61K31/00, A61K33/00, A61K38/00, C12N15/11, C12Q1/68
[2000/43]
Former International [2000/25]A61K31/00, A61K33/00, A61K38/00, C12N15/11, C12Q1/68
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2015/16]
Former [2000/25]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL 
TitleGerman:EXPRESSIONSSYSTEME DES BAK PROMOTORS[2000/25]
English:BAK PROMOTOR EXPRESSION SYSTEM[2000/25]
French:SYSTEME D'EXPRESSION DE PROMOTEUR DE BAK[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Search fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/25]
10.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.09.2007
12.09.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
13.09.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.06.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2015Fee for grant paid
19.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination23.08.2010Appeal received No.  T0206/11
21.10.2010Statement of grounds filed
16.09.2013Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2013/38]
14.03.2014Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.02.2005
Opposition(s)18.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 17
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 18
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9618738  (SUGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * & EMBL-ID:T30373 *;
 [E]WO9807870  (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US]) [E] 1-9 * the whole document, in particular pages 56-57 *;
 [E]WO9835056  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [E]WO9835016  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *
 [XY]  AVRAHAM S ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A NOVEL RELATED ADHESION FOCAL TYROSINE KINASE (RAFRK) FROM MEGAKARYOCYTES AND BRAIN", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, (1995), vol. 270, no. 46, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 27742 - 27751, XP002068186 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * & EMBL-ID=S80542 (15.08.96) * [Y] 7-9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.46.27742
 [Y]  H. LEIGHTON GRIMES ET AL.,, "The Gfi-1 protooncoprotein represses Bax expression and inhibits T-cell death", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (19961210), vol. 93, no. 25, pages 14569 - 14573, XP002146581 [Y] 7-9 * the whole document, in particular page 14570 last paragraph bridging left and right columns *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.25.14569
 [PX]  N.K. OSSINA ET AL.,, "Interferon-gamma modulates a p53-independent apoptotic pathway and apoptosis-related gene expression", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19970627), vol. 272, no. 26, pages 16351 - 16357, XP002146582 [PX] 1-9 * the whole document, in particular page 6356 left column (footnotes) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.26.16351
International search[X]WO9515084  (LXR BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al);
 [A]  - FARROW S. N., ET AL., "CLONING OF A BCL-2 HOMOLOGUE BY INTERACTION WITH ADENOVIRUS E1B 19K", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19950420), vol. 374., doi:10.1038/374731a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 731 - 733., XP002910966

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374731a0
 [A]  - CHITTENDEN T., ET AL., "INDUCTION OF APOPTOSIS BY THE BCL-2 HOMOLOGUE BAK.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19950420), vol. 374., doi:10.1038/374733a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 733 - 736., XP002910967

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374733a0
 [A]  - KIEFER M. C., ET AL., "MODULATION OF APOPTOSIS BY THE WIDELY DISTRIBUTED BCL-2 HOMOLOGUE BAK.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19950420), vol. 374., doi:10.1038/374736a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 736 - 739., XP002910968

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/374736a0
 [A]  - CHITTENDEN T., ET AL., "A CONSERVED DOMAIN IN BAK, DISTINCT FROM BH1 AND BH2, MEDIATES CELL DEATH AND PROTEIN BINDING FUNCTIONS.", EMBO JOURNAL., OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY., GB, GB, (19951122), vol. 374., ISSN 0261-4189, pages 5589 - 5596., XP002910969
by applicant   - Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, vol. 1-3,
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, GREENE PUBLISHING AND WILEY-INTERSCIENCE,