Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0963542

EP0963542 - CORIOLIS FLOWMETER HAVING AXIALLY COMPLIANT CASE ENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MICRO MOTION INCORPORATED
7070 Winchester Circle Boulder
Colorado 80301 / US
[2017/47]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
MICRO MOTION INCORPORATED
7070 Winchester Circle
Boulder Colorado 80301 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VAN CLEVE, Craig, Brainerd
226 High Street
Lyons, CO 80540 / US
02 / LOVING, Roger, Scott
2160 James Canyon Drive
Boulder, CO 80302 / US
03 / LANHAM, Gregory, Treat
1612 - 6th Avenue
Longmont, CO 80501 / US
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/47]
Former [2007/42]Heunemann, Dieter , et al
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2007/39]Heunemann, Dieter
Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [1999/50]Bibby, William Mark , et al
Mathisen, Macara & Co., The Coach House, 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date98906460.517.02.1998
[1999/50]
WO1998US02940
Priority number, dateUS1997080705927.02.1997         Original published format: US 807059
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9838479
Date:03.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0963542
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1998
[1999/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0963542
Date:15.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/42]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0963542
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01F1/84
[1999/50]
Designated contracting statesDE [2017/47]
Former [1999/50]DE 
TitleGerman:CORIOLISDURCHFLUSSMESSER MIT AXIAL NACHGIEBIGEN GEHÄUSEENDEN[1999/50]
English:CORIOLIS FLOWMETER HAVING AXIALLY COMPLIANT CASE ENDS[1999/50]
French:DEBITMETRE A FORCE DE CORIOLIS POSSEDANT DES FONDS DE BOITIER A COMPLIANCE AXIALE[1999/50]
Entry into regional phase28.05.1999National basic fee paid 
28.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/50]
07.01.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.04.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2003Fee for grant paid
25.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.07.2004  16.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
ENDRESS + Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co.KG
Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/22]
Opponent(s)01  14.07.2004  16.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
ENDRESS + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH
Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
Former [2004/39]
Opponent(s)01  14.07.2004  16.08.2004  ADMISSIBLE
ENDRESS + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH
Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
Opponent's representative
Kirst, Michael (Angestellter)
Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH Colmarer Strasse 6
79576 Weil am Rhein / DE
19.08.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.02.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.10.2007Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
31.10.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
29.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2011Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.12.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.10.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.06.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
05.09.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition28.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0556/13
30.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
14.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
27.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0556/13
25.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
14.10.2016Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
03.01.2008Appeal received No.  T0151/08
07.03.2008Statement of grounds filed
18.11.2010Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
14.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.10.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0759542  (OVAL CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,14,16,17 * column 7, line 25 - column 8, line 54; figure 4 *;
 [X]FR2598801  (ASSISTANCE INDLE DAUPHINOISE A [FR]) [X] 1,2,11 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 18; figure 6 *;
 [X]EP0448913  (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,14-17 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 20; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0261435  (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [A] 18 * column 5, line 37 - column 7, line 22; figure 3 *
OppositionEP0759542
 FR2598801
 EP0448913
 EP0261436
 FR22598801
 EP0733886
 EP0045646