Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971935

EP0971935 - PROCESS FOR MAKING AND USING BISARYL DIPHOSPHATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200 West Lafayette
Indiana 47906 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200
West Lafayette Indiana 47906 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARTLEY, David, W.
2403 Marana Court
West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US
02 / LAWLOR, Timothy, J.
4612 Doe Path Lane
Lafayette, IN 47905 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Atkinson, Peter Birch , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date98906465.410.02.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US02968
Priority number, dateUS19970038734P14.02.1997         Original published format: US 38734 P
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835970
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971935
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07F9/02, C08K5/52
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON BISARYLDIPHOSPHATEN[2000/03]
English:PROCESS FOR MAKING AND USING BISARYL DIPHOSPHATES[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DE BISARYL-DIPHOSPHATES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase12.08.1999National basic fee paid 
12.08.1999Search fee paid 
12.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
12.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
12.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
25.01.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[PA]WO9747631  (GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORP) [PA] 1-15 * page 2, line 10 *;
 [PX]EP0795570  (TOSHIBA CHEM CORP) [PX] 1,9 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 42; examples C,3; claims 5,6 *;
 [A]WO9516736  (DOW CHEMICAL CO ;NUFFEL CLAUDE T E VAN (BE); VANEECKHOUTTE RIK G () [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 29 *
International search[A]US2520090  ;
 [A]US4267127  ;
 [A]US5135973