blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0962092

EP0962092 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERING QUANTIZED COEFFICIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 09.03.2011  [2011/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mediatek Inc.
No. 1-2, Innovation Road 1, Science Based Industrial Park
Hsin Chu City / TW
For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/33]For all designated states
Mediatek Inc.
No. 1-2, Innovation Road 1, Science Based Industrial Park
Hsin Chu City / TW
For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
Sarnoff Corporation
201 Washington Road, CN 5300
Princeton, NJ 08543-5300 / US
For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FLORENCIO, Dinei, Afonso, Ferreira
4603 168th Ct. NE
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
02 / SODAGAR, Iraj
1010 Stony Brook Way
North Brunswick, NJ 08902-9598 / US
[1999/50]
Former [1999/49]01 / FLORENCIO, Dinei, Afonso, Ferreira
2509 Hunters Glen Drive
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
02 / SODAGAR, Iraj
1010 Stony Brook Way
North Brunswick, NJ 08902-9598 / US
Representative(s)Meldrum, David James, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/11]Meldrum, David James, et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2007/51]Turner, James Arthur, et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [1999/49]Pratt, Richard Wilson
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98906493.618.02.1998
[1999/49]
WO1998US03031
Priority number, dateUS1997003884618.02.1997         Original published format: US 38846
US1998002408417.02.1998         Original published format: US 24084
[1999/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9836553
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0962092
Date:08.12.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.05.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/00, H04N7/30
[2001/25]
CPC:
H04N19/85 (EP,US); H04N19/122 (EP,US); H04N19/124 (EP,US);
H04N19/137 (EP,US); H04N19/14 (EP,US); H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US); H04N19/63 (EP,US); H04N19/10 (EP,US);
H04N19/102 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1999/49]H04N1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG VON QUANTISIERTEN KOEFFIZIENTEN[1999/49]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERING QUANTIZED COEFFICIENTS[1999/49]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL SERVANT A RECUPERER DES COEFFICIENTS QUANTIFIES[1999/49]
Entry into regional phase23.08.1999National basic fee paid 
23.08.1999Search fee paid 
23.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/49]
18.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2006Date of oral proceedings
10.03.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
02.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/10]
11.11.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/10]
Appeal following examination21.07.2006Appeal received No.  T1616/06
29.09.2006Statement of grounds filed
16.11.2010Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
16.11.2010Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
09.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
13.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
15.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
18.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
25.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0659019  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 53 * [A] 3-8,10;
 [XA]  - KWAK H Y ET AL, "PROJECTION-BASED EIGENVECTOR DECOMPOSITION FOR REDUCTION OF BLOCKING ARTIFACTS OF DCT CODED IMAGE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. (ICIP),US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19951023), ISBN 0-7803-3122-2, pages 527 - 530, XP000624022 [X] 1,9 * page 527, column R, paragraph 2 - page 529, column L, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [A] 2-8,10
International search[X]US5590222  (KOJIMA YUICHI [JP]);
 [A]US5495538  (FAN ZHIGANG [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.