Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983061

EP0983061 - METHODS FOR ADMINISTERING NUTRITIONAL INDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2006  [2006/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bonadio, George A. H.
373 East Avenue
Watertown, NY 13601-3829 / US
[2000/10]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Linn, Samuel Jonathan , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Linn, Samuel Jonathan , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98906522.212.02.1998
[2000/10]
WO1998US03095
Priority number, dateUS1997080277718.02.1997         Original published format: US 802777
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9835669
Date:20.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0983061
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/28, A61K33/24, A61P43/00
[2006/02]
Former International [2000/10]A61K31/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNGSMETHODEN VON ENDIUM AUS ERNÄHRUNGSELEMENTEN[2000/10]
English:METHODS FOR ADMINISTERING NUTRITIONAL INDIUM[2000/10]
French:PROCEDES D'ADMINISTRATION D'INDIUM ALIMENTAIRE[2000/10]
Entry into regional phase17.11.1999National basic fee paid 
17.11.1999Search fee paid 
17.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/10]
30.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/40]
18.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
17.11.1999AT   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999BE   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999CH   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999DE   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999DK   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999ES   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999FI   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999GR   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999IE   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999LU   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999MC   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999PT   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
17.11.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.11.1999M01   Fee paid on   17.11.1999
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200609   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4182754  (BONADIO GEORGE A H [US]) [X] 1-16 *cf.abstract, col. 1, lines 49-63, col. 2, lines 40-47, claims 1-4*
International search[Y]US3937806  (COOLEY WILLIAM EDWARD);
 [Y]US4182754  (BONADIO GEORGE A H [US]);
 [Y]US4591506  (BONADIO GEORGE A H [US])