Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964677

EP0964677 - SUSTAINED ANALGESIA ACHIEVED WITH TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF BUPRENORPHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/51]SUSTAINED ANALGESIA ACHIEVED WITH BUPRENORPHINE
[2005/52]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.2017Petition for review: decisionpublished on 05.07.2017  [2017/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
2, avenue Charles de Gaulle
1653 Luxembourg / LU
[2008/23]
Former [2006/33]For all designated states
Euro-Celtique S.A.
122, Boulevard de la Pétrusse
2330 Luxembourg / LU
Former [2004/42]For all designated states
EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.
122, Boulevard de la Pétrusse
2330 Luxembourg / LU
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
Euro-Celtique S.A.
122 Boulevard de la Petrusse
2330 Luxembourg / LU
Inventor(s)01 / REDER, Robert, F.
2 Mercia Lane
Greenwich, CT 06830 / US
02 / GOLDENHEIM, Paul, D.
4 Bald Hill Place
Wilton, CT 06897 / US
03 / KAIKO, Robert F.
10 Norfield Woods Road
Weston, CT 06883 / US
[2000/03]
Former [1999/51]01 / REDER, Robert, F.
2 Mercia Lane
Greenwich, CT 06830 / US
02 / GOLDENHEIM, Paul, D.
4 Bald Hill Place
Wilton, CT 06897 / US
Representative(s)Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/41]Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Former [2004/01]Ruffles, Graham Keith
Marks & Clerk 66-68 Hills Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire, CB2 1LA / GB
Former [1999/51]Ruffles, Graham Keith
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98906678.224.02.1998
[1999/51]
WO1998US03584
Priority number, dateUS19970038919P24.02.1997         Original published format: US 38919 P
US1997093906829.09.1997         Original published format: US 939068
[1999/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9836728
Date:27.08.1998
[1998/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0964677
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[1999/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0964677
Date:16.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61K31/485, A61K9/70
[2002/51]
Former International [2000/03]A61F13/00
Former International [1999/51]A61K31/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/51]
Extension statesAL07.07.1999
LT07.07.1999
LV07.07.1999
MK07.07.1999
RO07.07.1999
SI07.07.1999
TitleGerman:VERZÖGERTE ANALGESIE ERREICHT MIT TRANSDERMALER VERABREICHUNG VON BUPRENORPHIN[2005/52]
English:SUSTAINED ANALGESIA ACHIEVED WITH TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF BUPRENORPHINE[2006/01]
French:ANALGESIE A EFFET PROLONGE GRACE A L'ADMINISTRATION TRANSDERMALE DE LA BUPRENORPHINE[2005/52]
Former [1999/51]VERZÖGERTER ANALGESIE ERREICHT MIT BUPRENORPHIN
Former [1999/51]SUSTAINED ANALGESIA ACHIEVED WITH BUPRENORPHINE
Former [1999/51]ANALGESIE A EFFET PROLONGE GRACE A DE LA BUPRENORPHINE
Entry into regional phase07.07.1999National basic fee paid 
07.07.1999Search fee paid 
07.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.07.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
07.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/51]
28.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2003Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2006Fee for grant paid
19.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05011213.5  / EP1570823
EP06118876.9  / EP1731152
EP10185230.9  / EP2305191
EP10185233.3  / EP2305192
EP10185235.8  / EP2301493
EP10185237.4  / EP2305193
EP10185240.8  / EP2305194
EP10185241.6  / EP2301494
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
 02  16.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Luye Pharma AG
Am Windfeld 35
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [2017/16]
Former [2015/32]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner, et al
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 02  16.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Acino AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/16]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus, et al
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 02  16.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Acino AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [2009/14]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus, et al
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 02  16.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Novosis AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [2007/26]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus, et al
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 02  16.05.2007  24.05.2007  ADMISSIBLE
Novosis AG
Carl-Feichtner-Ring 1
83714 Miesbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al
BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32
80331 München / DE
Former [2007/25]
Opponent(s)01  15.05.2007   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
ter Meer, Nicolaus, et al
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
21.06.2007Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.12.2007Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.06.2009Date of oral proceedings
24.07.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
24.07.2009Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.03.2015Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/32]
29.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
30.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.09.2009Appeal received No.  T1938/09
24.11.2009Statement of grounds filed
09.03.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
Petition(s) for review:03.03.2015Petition for review received
 Number:  R0002/15
 for appeal No.  T1938/09-3302
 Petitioner:  APPR
21.11.2016Decision:  Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only.
14.09.2015Petition for review received
 Number:  R0005/15
 for appeal No.  T1938/09-3302
 Petitioner:  APPR
29.05.2017Decision:  Rejection of petition for review.
09.03.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.03.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
16.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
06.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US4956171  (CHANG YUNIK [US]) [X] 1-37 * examples 1,3 * * column 4, lines 29,45,53 *;
 [Y]  - FRIEND D ET AL, "SIMPLE ALKYL ESTERS AS SKIN PERMEATION ENHANCERS", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890601), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 33 - 41, XP000007883 [Y] 1-37 * figures 11,12 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(89)90031-X
 [Y]  - FRIEND D ET AL, "TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF LEVONORGESTREL I: ALKANOLS AS PERMEATION ENHANCERS IN VITRO", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19880901), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 243 - 250, XP000566313 [Y] 1-37 * figures 2,3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(88)90057-0
 [Y]  - ROY S D ET AL, "CONTROLLED TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY OF FENTANYL: CHARACTERIZATIONS OF PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVES FOR MATRIX PATCH DESIGN", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION. WASHINGTON, US, (19960501), vol. 85, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 491 - 495, XP000583527 [Y] 1-37 * figure 5 * * page 495, second paragraph *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/js950415w
International search[Y]US5026556  (DRUST EUGENE G [US], et al);
 [Y]US5069909  (SHARMA KULDEEPAK [US], et al);
 [Y]US5225199  (HIDAKA OSAFUMI [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5240711  (HILLE THOMAS [DE], et al);
 [Y]US5486362  (KITCHELL JUDITH P [US], et al);
 [A]US5132115  (WOLTER KARIN [DE], et al);
 [A]US4906463  (CLEARY GARY W [US], et al)
ExaminationWO9619975