Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973622

EP0973622 - AMINE CURED FOUNDRY BINDER SYSTEMS AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.12.2016  [2016/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASK Chemicals L.P.
5200 Blazer Parkway
Dublin, OH 43017 / US
[2012/38]
Former [2007/02]For all designated states
Ashland Licensing and Intellectual Property LLC
5200 Blazer Parkway
Dublin, OH 43017 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
ASHLAND INC.
P.O. Box 2219
Columbus, OH 43216 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARCHIBALD, James, J.
2910 Heatherleaf Way
Columbus, OH 43231 / US
02 / SHERIDAN, Matthew, S.
49 Spicewood Land
Powell, OH 43065 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Schellerdamm 19
21079 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/12]Müller Schupfner & Partner
Schellerdamm 19
21079 Hamburg / DE
Former [2011/08]Schupfner, Georg , et al
Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1
21244 Buchholz / DE
Former [2010/01]Bülle, Jan , et al
Patentanwälte Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/04]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98906696.425.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US03644
Priority number, dateUS1997081139504.03.1997         Original published format: US 811395
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9839119
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973622
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.09.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2009
ClassificationInternational:B22C1/22, B22C9/02
[2016/02]
Former International [2000/04]B22C9/02, B22C1/22, B22D15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesAL04.10.1999
LT04.10.1999
LV04.10.1999
MK04.10.1999
RO04.10.1999
SI04.10.1999
TitleGerman:AMINGEHÄRTETE GIESSEREIBINDERSYSTEME UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2016/02]
English:AMINE CURED FOUNDRY BINDER SYSTEMS AND THEIR USES[2000/04]
French:SYSTEMES DE LIANTS DE FONDERIE DURCIS EN PRESENCE D'UNE AMINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]AMINGEHÄRTENDE GIESSEREIBINDERSYSTEME UND DEREN VERWENDUNG
Entry into regional phase04.10.1999National basic fee paid 
04.10.1999Search fee paid 
04.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
14.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/49]
21.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.09.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
25.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 15
26.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 16
25.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 17
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 18
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   04.08.2000
29.02.201619   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5596021  (ADEMBRI ANDREA [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 41 * * column 5, lines 9-14 * * column 7, lines 23-36 * * column 6, lines 18-42 * * example 3 * * claim 6 * [Y] 11-13;
 [XY]GB2011432  (ICI LTD) [X] 14 * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 87 * [Y] 11-13;
 PL124275B  [ ] (UNIWERSYTET MARIE CURIE-SKLODOWSKIEJ, POL.)
 [A]  MATYNIA, TADEUSZ ET AL, "Cured epoxy acrylate resins", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 103:7334, URL: STN, XP002557668 [A] 1-14 * abstract *
International search[X]US5596021  (ADEMBRI ANDREA [IT], et al);
 [A]US5468832  (SCHRADER LUTZ [DE], et al);
 [A]US5286765  (FRANKE JOACHIM [DE], et al);
 [A]US4526219  (DUNNAVANT WILLIAM R [US], et al)