Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1011595

EP1011595 - METHODS AND EQUIPMENT FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING MUSCLE PAIN OR INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.02.2002
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.04.2002  [2002/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Myopoint, Inc.
Suite 465, 1205 Prospect Street
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2000/26]
Inventor(s)01 / HUBBARD, David R.
Suite 465, 1205 Prospect Street
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
02 / JOHNSON, Paul
Suite 465, 1205 Prospect Street
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Schlee, Alexander Richard
Viering, Jentschura & Partner
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Schlee, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing.
Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date98906717.826.02.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998US03760
Priority number, dateUS1997081226006.03.1997         Original published format: US 812260
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9838902
Date:11.09.1998
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1011595
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998
[2000/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61H1/02
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN ODER VERHINDERN VON MUSKELSCHMERZ ODER MUSKELVERLETZUNGEN[2000/26]
English:METHODS AND EQUIPMENT FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING MUSCLE PAIN OR INJURY[2000/26]
French:PROCEDES ET EQUIPEMENT POUR TRAITER OU PREVENIR LES DOULEURS OU BLESSURES MUSCULAIRES[2000/26]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999National basic fee paid 
05.10.1999Search fee paid 
05.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/26]
01.09.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/15]
16.10.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5454773  (BLANCHARD FREDERICK W [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 39 * * column 9, line 56 - column 10, line 10 * * column 10, line 29 - line 63 * * column 12, line 16 - line 46; figures 1,3,9,13,14,17,19,20,22-25 *;
 [X]US5277681  (HOLT LAURENCE E [CA]) [X] 1,2,9,15-17 * column 9, line 61 - column 10, line 14; figures 1,2,11 *;
 [X]US1482173  (WILLARD CHARLES E) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1, line 61 - line 95; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US4114610  (KOCH GUIDO) [X] 1,2,4,7,12,13,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2152431  (HJALMAR JENSEN SIGVARD) [X] 1,8-10,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5588704  (HARZA RICHARD D [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10,14 * the whole document *