Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968487

EP0968487 - PRINTER WITH JOURNAL STORAGE AND TWO INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]PRINTER WITH JOURNAL STORAGE
[2001/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.06.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 28.07.2004  [2004/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wincor Nixdorf International GmbH
Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1
33106 Paderborn / DE
[2002/42]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
Wincor Nixdorf GmbH & Co KG
Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1
33106 Paderborn / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme AG
Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1
33106 Paderborn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HEISE, Wolfgang
Fasanenweg 16
D-33104 Paderborn / DE
02 / SCHRÖDER, Michael
Kettlerstrasse 16
D-33161 Hövelhof / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2000/37]
Former [2000/01]Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date98906821.816.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998DE00147
Priority number, dateDE199710654319.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19706543
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9837527
Date:27.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968487
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968487
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:G07G5/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:DRUCKER MIT JOURNALSPEICHER UND ZWEI SCHNITTSTELLEN[2001/39]
English:PRINTER WITH JOURNAL STORAGE AND TWO INTERFACES[2001/39]
French:IMPRIMANTE COMPORTANT UNE MEMOIRE DE JOURNAL ET DEUX INTERFACES[2001/39]
Former [2000/01]DRUCKER MIT JOURNALSPEICHER
Former [2000/01]PRINTER WITH JOURNAL STORAGE
Former [2000/01]IMPRIMANTE COMPORTANT UNE MEMOIRE DE JOURNAL
Entry into regional phase05.08.1999National basic fee paid 
05.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
12.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2002Fee for grant paid
15.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
AT16.01.2003
BE31.01.2003
[2004/31]
Former [2004/28]GB18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
BE31.01.2003
Former [2004/21]GB18.09.2002
SE18.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE18.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE2322227  (MICHAELIS HORST DR ING) [Y] 1,2,5,10,11 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * claim - *;
 [Y]US4425619  (MATSUDA KUMEHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,10,11 * column 2, line 43 * * column 3, line 10 - line 31 * * figure . *;
 [A]JPS59197958  ;
 [A]JPS5875268
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850319), vol. 009, no. 062, Database accession no. (P - 342), [A] 1,3,10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830723), vol. 007, no. 168, Database accession no. (P - 212), [A] 1,8,10 * abstract *
by applicantUS5477037
 DE2950949