blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0961611

EP0961611 - EXPANDABLE GASTRO-RETENTIVE THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WITH CONTROLLED ACTIVE SUBSTANCE RELEASE IN THE GASTRO-INTESTINAL TRACT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme GmbH
Irlicher Strasse 55
56567 Neuwied / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ASMUSSEN, Bodo
Schlossgarten 10
D-56170 Bendorf / DE
02 / CREMER, Karsten
Vorgebirgsstrasse 47
D-53119 Bonn / DE
03 / HOFFMANN, Hans-Rainer
Burghofstrasse 123
D-56566 Neuwied / DE
04 / LUDWIG, Karin
Langendorfer Strasse 151
D-56564 Neuwied / DE
05 / ROREGER, Michael
Pestalozzistrasse 38
D-56567 Neuwied / DE
[1999/49]
Representative(s)Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter
Flaccus Müller-Wolff
Patentanwälte
Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
Application number, filing date98906865.509.01.1998
[1999/49]
WO1998EP00099
Priority number, dateDE199710091514.01.1997         Original published format: DE 19700915
[1999/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9831341
Date:23.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0961611
Date:08.12.1999
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0961611
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/00, A61D7/00, A61M31/00
[1999/49]
CPC:
A61K9/4808 (EP,US); A61K9/00 (KR); A61D7/00 (EP,US);
A61K9/0065 (EP,US); A61K9/009 (EP,US); A61M31/002 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP); A61P1/04 (EP); A61P3/04 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/49]
Extension statesSI08.07.1999
TitleGerman:EXPANDIERBARES GASTRORETENTIVES THERAPIE-SYSTEM MIT KONTROLLIERTER WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG IM GASTROINTESTINALTRAKT[1999/49]
English:EXPANDABLE GASTRO-RETENTIVE THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WITH CONTROLLED ACTIVE SUBSTANCE RELEASE IN THE GASTRO-INTESTINAL TRACT[1999/49]
French:SYSTEME THERAPEUTIQUE GASTRO-RETENTIF POUVANT S'EXPANSER, A LIBERATION CONTROLEE DE PRINCIPES ACTIFS DANS LE TRACTUS GASTRO-INTESTINAL[1999/49]
Entry into regional phase08.07.1999National basic fee paid 
08.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/49]
08.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.10.2001Fee for grant paid
01.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US4207890  (MAMAJEK RONALD C [US], et al);
 [A]DE3400106  (BREMECKER KLAUS DIETER DR) [A] 1-21 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 7, line 1O * * page 8, line 11 - line 35 * * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 7 * * page 13, line 20 - line 35 * * page 14, line 27 - line 36; claims 1-4,10 *;
 [A]US4849246  (SCHMIDT WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 21 * column A * * column 3, line 4 - line 65; example 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0338383  (SANOL ARZNEI SCHWARZ GMBH [DE]);
 [A]EP0408496  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-21 * column A * * page 1, line 1 - line 23 * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 58; example 1; claims 1-5,8-10,23 *;
 [A]US4996058  (SINNREICH JOEL [CH]);
 [X]US5260069  (CHEN CHIH-MING [US]) [X] 1-21 * column A * * column 1, line 13 - line 26 * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 41 * * column 3, line 33 - line 59; figures 1-3; example 1; claims 1,14 *;
 [A]EP0669129  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * column A * * page 2, line 8 - column 52 * * page 4, line 42 - line 49; examples 5,6; claims 1-4,8 *
by applicantUS4207890
 EP0307904
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.