blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967991

EP0967991 - INFECTIOUS BURSITIS VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIMMINACO AG
Zürichstrasse 12
8134 Adliswil / CH
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / DAVELAAR, Frans, Gerrit
Harderwijkstraat 85
NL-3881 EG Putten / NL
02 / PITSTRA, Bernarda, Johanna
Mouterspad 244
NL-1383 DK Weesp / NL
03 / VAN WILTENBURG, Nico
Koomanstraat 1G
NL-1391 VZ Abcoude / NL
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Mannion, Sally Kim
Wyeth Laboratories
Huntercombe Lane South
Taplow
Maidenhead
Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Mannion, Sally Kim, Dr.
c/o Wyeth Laboratories, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow
Maidenhead, Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB
Application number, filing date98906897.829.01.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP00461
Priority number, dateEP1997020029803.02.1997         Original published format: EP 97200298
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9833522
Date:06.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967991
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967991
Date:26.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/12, C12N7/08, A61K35/76
[2000/01]
CPC:
C12N7/00 (EP,US); A61K39/12 (EP,KR,US); A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP); A61K2039/5254 (EP,US); A61K2039/552 (EP,US);
A61K2039/70 (EP,US); C12N2720/10034 (EP,US); C12N2760/18134 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesAL14.07.1999
LT14.07.1999
LV14.07.1999
MK14.07.1999
RO14.07.1999
SI14.07.1999
TitleGerman:VAKZINE GEGEN INFEKTIÖSE BURSITIS[2000/01]
English:INFECTIOUS BURSITIS VACCINE[2000/01]
French:VACCIN CONTRE LA BURSITE INFECTIEUSE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase14.07.1999National basic fee paid 
14.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
05.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2006Fee for grant paid
31.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
09.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
IE29.01.2007
LU29.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
[2010/05]
Former [2008/21]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
GR27.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
IE29.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
Former [2008/15]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
IT26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
IE29.01.2007
MC31.01.2007
Former [2007/29]AT26.07.2006
BE26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/23]AT26.07.2006
CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/22]CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
DK26.10.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Former [2007/17]CH26.07.2006
FI26.07.2006
LI26.07.2006
SE26.10.2006
PT26.12.2006
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4824668  (MELCHIOR JR FRED W [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * claims 2-24 * [Y] 1,3-5;
 [A]WO9105569  (UNIV MARYLAND [US]) [A] * claims 1-8 *;
 [XY]US5192539  (VAN DER MAREL PIET [NL], et al) [X] 1,5 * claims 1-3 * [Y] 1,3-5;
 [XY]EP0600723  (ABIC LTD [IL]) [X] 1,5 * page 2, line 49 - page 3, line 44; claims 1,10 * [Y] 1,3-5;
 [A]  - LASHER H N ET AL, "Infectious bursal disease.", WORLD'S POULTRY SCIENCE JOURNAL 50 (2). 1994. 133-166. ISSN: 0043-9339, XP002041802 [A] * see page 149, paragraph Prevention of IBD *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1079/WPS19940013
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.