Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968359

EP0968359 - LOAD ADJUSTMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2003
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BEIL, Egon
Hundsrückenstrasse 2
D-61197 Florstadt / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/20]
Former [2000/01]Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys.
Kruppstrasse 105
60388 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date98906934.907.02.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP00675
Priority number, dateDE199711140819.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19711408
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841745
Date:24.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968359
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968359
Date:02.10.2002
Language:DE
[2002/40]
Search report(s)International search reportEP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:F02D9/02
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:LASTVERSTELLVORRICHTUNG[2000/01]
English:LOAD ADJUSTMENT DEVICE[2000/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DE CHARGE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase09.09.1999National basic fee paid 
09.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
28.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.07.2002Fee for grant paid
08.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE19524941  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 3 - line 14 * * column 3, line 35 - line 51; figure 24 * [Y] 3,4;
 [Y]US4989566  (WALLERAND PHILIPPE [FR]) [Y] 3,4 * column 3, line 40 - line 45; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4132653  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 47; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]DE4315010  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - line 66; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5133320  (KATO HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE4013823  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [A]DE19519836  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 8; figures 4,5 *