blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970034

EP0970034 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBOXYLIC ACIDS OR THEIR ESTERS BY CARBONYLATION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHÄFER, Martin
Luitpoldstrasse 65
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
02 / HÖHN, Arthur
Oberer Waldweg 17
D-67281 Kirchheim / DE
03 / HARDER, Wolfgang
Bergwaldstrasse 16
D-69469 Weinheim / DE
04 / LIPPERT, Ferdinand
Wellsring 16
D-67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98906940.609.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP00708
Priority number, dateDE199710687621.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19706876
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9837049
Date:27.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970034
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.1998
ClassificationIPC:C07C51/14, C07C67/38, B01J23/84, B01J23/89
[2000/02]
CPC:
B01J31/0239 (EP); C07C51/14 (EP,KR); B01J31/0234 (EP);
B01J31/0244 (EP); B01J31/0267 (EP); B01J31/20 (EP);
C07C67/38 (EP); B01J2231/321 (EP); B01J2531/821 (EP);
B01J2531/847 (EP); B01J31/2234 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
C07C51/14, C07C53/122 (EP);
C07C67/38, C07C69/24 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBONSÄUREN ODER DEREN ESTERN DURCH CARBONYLIERUNG VON OLEFINEN[2000/02]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBOXYLIC ACIDS OR THEIR ESTERS BY CARBONYLATION OF OLEFINS[2000/02]
French:PRODUCTION D'ACIDES CARBOXYLIQUES OU DE LEURS ESTERS PAR CARBONYLATION D'OLEFINES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase10.08.1999National basic fee paid 
10.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
31.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[DY]DE4424710  (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1-9,11 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]DE868150  (BASF AG) [Y] 1-9,11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]GB2089803  (HALCON SD GROUP INC) [Y] 1-9,11 * claim 1 *;
 [Y]US4257973  (MROWCA JOSEPH J) [Y] 1-9,11 * examples 53,54 *;
 [Y]US4588834  (LARKIN JOHN M [US]) [Y] 1-9,11 * abstract *;
 [A]DE2161460  (DENKI K.K.K.K.) [A] 1-9,11;
 [X]EP0737669  (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [X] 10 * examples 4-18,20-66 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.