EP0973575 - GENE THERAPEUTIC TREATMENT OF BLOOD VESSEL ASSOCIATED DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuven Research & Development vzw Groot Begijnhof, Benedenstraat 59 3000 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Vlaams Interuniversitair Instituut voor Biotechnologie vzw. Rijvisschestraat 118, Bus 1 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Leuven Research & Development V.Z.W. Groot Begijnhof, Benedenstraat 60 3000 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Vlaams Interuniversitair Instituut voor Biotechnologie vzw. Rijvisschestraat 118, Bus 1 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VARENNE, Olivier, Henry Square Guy d'Arezzo 7 B-1180 Brussel / BE | 02 /
COLLEN, Désiré, José Schoonzichtlaan 20 B-3020 Winksele / BE | 03 /
JANSSENS, Stefan, Pierre Koning Leopold-III-laan 53 B-3001 Heverlee / BE | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2000/04] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98906942.2 | 09.02.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998EP00723 | Priority number, date | EP19970200330 | 07.02.1997 Original published format: EP 97200330 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9834667 | Date: | 13.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973575 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/10, A61K48/00 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
C12Y114/13039 (EP,US);
A61K47/6957 (EP,US);
A61K38/44 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
A61M2025/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/04] | Title | German: | GENTHERAPEUTISCHE BEHANDLUNG VON MIT BLUTGEFÄSS ASSOZIERTEN ERKRANKUNGEN. | [2000/04] | English: | GENE THERAPEUTIC TREATMENT OF BLOOD VESSEL ASSOCIATED DISORDERS | [2000/04] | French: | TRAITEMENT PAR THERAPIE GENIQUE DES TROUBLES ASSOCIES AUX VAISSEAUX SANGUINS | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.05.2000 | 28.02.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2001 | 28.02.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9211895 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-8* page 1, line 30 - page 3, line 15 *; | [A]WO9605321 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [A] 5-8 * page 2, line 7 - line 14 * * page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 6 *; | [DX]EP0753322 (INTERVENTIONAL TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [DX] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DPX]EP0768098 (INTERVENTIONAL TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [DPX] 1-4 * the whole document * |