Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970025

EP0970025 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A MULTILAYER OPTICAL MATERIAL WITH CROSSLINKING-DENSIFYING BY ULTRAVIOLET RADIATION AND RESULTING OPTICAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.07.2002  [2002/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique
31-33, rue de la Fédération
75008 Paris / FR
[2001/30]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
31-33, rue de la Fédération
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BELLEVILLE, Philippe
6, avenue du Château du Loir
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
02 / PRENE, Philippe
10, rue du Dahomey
F-75011 Paris / FR
[2000/02]
Representative(s)des Termes, Monique , et al
Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Des Termes, Monique , et al
Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98906990.106.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998FR00230
Priority number, dateFR1997000148410.02.1997         Original published format: FR 9701484
[2000/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9834884
Date:13.08.1998
Language:FR
[1998/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970025
Date:12.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970025
Date:25.07.2001
Language:FR
[2001/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/34, G02B1/10, G02B1/11
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN OPTISCHEN GEGENSTANDS MIT VERNETZUNGS-VERDICHTUNG DURCH BELICHTUNG MIT UV-STRAHLUNG UND SO ERHALTENER OPTISCHER GEGENSTAND[2000/02]
English:METHOD FOR PREPARING A MULTILAYER OPTICAL MATERIAL WITH CROSSLINKING-DENSIFYING BY ULTRAVIOLET RADIATION AND RESULTING OPTICAL MATERIAL[2000/02]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN MATERIAU OPTIQUE MULTICOUCHES AVEC RETICULATION-DENSIFICATION PAR INSOLATION AUX RAYONS ULTRAVIOLETS ET MATERIAU OPTIQUE AINSI PREPARE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase30.07.1999National basic fee paid 
30.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
06.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2001Fee for grant paid
10.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH06345488  ;
 [A]JPH05247657  ;
 [A]JPH0762323  ;
 [A]JPH05270864  ;
 [DA]FR2682486  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [DA] 1-23 * claim - *;
 [DA]FR2680583  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [DA] 1-23 * claims 1-12 *;
 [A]EP0515848  (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-23 * examples 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0492785  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-23 * claim - *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 095, no. 003, & JP06345488 A 19941220 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940106), vol. 018, no. 004, Database accession no. (C - 1149), & JP05247657 A 19930924 (NISSHA PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 095, no. 006, & JP07062323 A 19950307 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 46, Database accession no. 93-364968, XP002047221 & JPH05270864 A 19931019 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract *