blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970290

EP0970290 - PICK HOLDER AND PICK BOX ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2002Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.05.2002  [2002/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bingham Engineering Ltd.
Wentdale, Doncaster Road East Hardwick
Pontefract WF8 3EQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Bingham Engineering Ltd.
Wentdale, Doncaster Road
East Hardwick, Pontefract WF8 3EQ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BINGHAM, Mark-Bingham Engineering Limited
Wentdale,Doncaster Road
East Hardwick, Pontefract WF8 3EQ / GB
02 / BINGHAM, Terence-Bingham Engineering Limited
Wentdale,Doncaster Road
East Hardwick, Pontefract WF8 3EQ / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Arena Point
Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Belcher, Simon James
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98906999.204.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998GB00493
Priority number, dateGB1997000455405.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9704554
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9839553
Date:11.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970290
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.09.1998
ClassificationIPC:E21C35/193
[2000/02]
CPC:
E21C35/193 (EP); E21C35/188 (EP); E21C35/191 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:MEISSELHALTER UND HALTEBLOCK VORRICHTUNG[2000/02]
English:PICK HOLDER AND PICK BOX ASSEMBLY[2000/02]
French:PORTE-PIC ET ENSEMBLE PORTE-PIC[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase05.10.1999National basic fee paid 
05.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
02.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.11.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
29.09.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/20]
07.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/20]
Request for further processing for:30.11.2000Request for further processing filed
30.11.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.12.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XY]AU564079B  (CINCINNATI MINE MACHINERY CO) [X] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 5,9,10;
 [Y]DE2330297  (KENNAMETAL INC) [Y] 5 * page 8; figures 3-5 *;
 [Y]AU536728B  (KENNAMETAL INC) [Y] 9,10 * page 11, paragraph 3 - page 12, line 1; figure 6 *;
 [X]GB2223045  (SANDVIK AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 10 - line 31 *;
 [A]EP0521413  (BOART HWF GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 3,7,8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE1275498  (EICKHOFF GEB) [A] 3,8 * column 2, line 20 - line 40; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE9402242U  (VOEST ALPINE BERGTECHNIK [AT]) [A] 3 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.